Carlton v. United States of America
Petitioner: Charles William Carlton
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00216
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Charles William Carlton. (NOTE: Consent/Reassignment form received by Clerk's Office subsequent to ORDER reclassify the motion) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js)
October 3, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Documents filed in criminal case at 3:12-cr-119 per Order at #4 . (pb)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to reclassify motion re #1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (General) filed by Charles William Carlton by Judge Peter D. Welte. (EA) Distributed on 10/3/2019 (pb).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case assigned to Judge Peter D. Welte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned to the case. (Case reassigned per chambers. No referral judge added) (Distributed on 10/2/2019.)(as)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Charles William Carlton. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/15/2019. (pb)
September 30, 2019 Filing fee: $5, receipt number 319000533 (pb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (General) by Charles William Carlton. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit of Charles Carlton, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Mailing Envelope)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlton v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles William Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?