Johnson v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Renetta Johnson
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00025
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Standard Insurance Company. (pb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Standard Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/30/2020. (rh)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) Modified on 4/16/2020 to remove "in chambers." NEF Regenerated. (as)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Standard Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Herring, Jacqueline)
March 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Standard Insurance Company answer due 4/15/2020. (pb)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #6 Stipulation filed by Standard Insurance Company. Answer is due by 4/15/2020. (LF)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company for Standard Insurance Company.. (Herring, Jacqueline)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for Extension of Time for Defendant Standard Insurance Company to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J. Herring on behalf of Standard Insurance Company (Herring, Jacqueline)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Renetta Johnson. (js)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Renetta Johnson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/4/2020. (js)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (js)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000184) filed by Renetta Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renetta Johnson
Represented By: Scott A. Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?