Koenig v. Traill County Water Resource District
Plaintiff: La Verne Koenig
Defendant: Traill County Water Resouce District and Traill County Water Resource District
Case Number: 3:2020cv00033
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 23 USCA ORDER Requesting Paper Record of Non-ECF Documents re #19 Notice of Appeal. None exist at this time. (pb)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of USCA as to #19 Notice of Appeal filed by La Verne Koenig. Appellant is directed to pay the filing fee or move for IFP by 04/28/2020. (pb)
March 31, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-1669 for #19 Notice of Appeal. (pb)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte denying #17 Motion to Stay and denying #18 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (EA) Distributed on 3/31/2020 (pb).
March 27, 2020 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet re #19 Notice of Appeal mailed to La Verne Koenig. (as)
March 27, 2020 Filing 20 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #19 Notice of Appeal (as)
March 27, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case opened with spelling error in defendants name. Clerk's office corrected from "Traill County Water Resouce District" to "Traill County Water Resource District." (as)
March 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #15 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Report and Recommendations by La Verne Koenig. Filing fee: IFP. (as)
March 27, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by La Verne Koenig. (as)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay re #15 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Report and Recommendations by La Verne Koenig. (as)
March 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Certified copy of Order at #15 remanding case to state court mailed to Clerk of East Central Judicial District, Traill County, Hillsboro, ND. (js)
March 25, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Traill County Water Resource District against La Verne Koenig. (pb) Distributed on 3/25/2020 (pb). Modified on 3/27/2020 to correct spelling of defendant name. (as)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte adopting #3 Report and Recommendations; denying #10 Motion to Disqualify Judge; granting #11 Motion to Remand; and, denying #14 Motion for Hearing. (EA) Distributed on 3/25/2020 (pb).
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Hearing re #12 Objection to Report and Recommendations by La Verne Koenig. (js)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by La Verne Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Opposition to Remand Motion)(js)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 OBJECTION by La Verne Koenig to #3 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Mailing Envelope)(as)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Traill County Water Resource District. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Gaustad, Daniel) Modified on 3/27/2020 to correct spelling of defendant name. (as)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Disqualify Judge by La Verne Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION by La Verne Koenig to #3 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - envelope dated 03/06/2020, #2 Exhibit 2 - envelope dated 03/09/2020, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge.(pb) Distributed on 3/17/2020 (pb).
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by La Verne Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to document: #5 Notice of Removal,, by La Verne Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Reply to Appellees Motion to Strike filed in Traill County District Court, 49-2019-cv-150, #2 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by La Verne Koenig from Traill County District Court, case number 49-2019-CV-00150 filed by La Verne Koenig. Filing fee: IFP (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Reply Brief, #2 Register of Actions, #3 Notice of Appeal, #4 Order, #5 Proposed Findings of Fact, #6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #7 Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #8 Motion to Take Judicial Notice) (js) (Main Document replaced on 3/11/2020 to remove attachments.) (lf)
March 9, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2020 (js)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. See written order at Doc. #3 . (LF) Modified to add language regarding filing fee per request of Chambers on 3/9/2020. Distributed on 3/9/2020 (pb).
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [1-1] Notice of Removal by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Objections due by March 23, 2020). (LF) Distributed on 3/9/2020 (pb). Modified on 3/10/2020 to correct objection due date. (js)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to La Verne Koenig. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/16/2020. (pb) Distributed on 3/6/2020 (pb).
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by La Verne Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Appellant's Reply Brief, #3 Register of Actions, #4 Notice of Appeal, #5 Order, #6 Proposed Findings of Fact, #7 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #8 Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #9 Motion to Take Judicial Notice)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koenig v. Traill County Water Resource District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traill County Water Resouce District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traill County Water Resource District
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Verne Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?