Feist v. Federal Bureau of Investigations
Plaintiff: Joshua Anthony Feist
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Case Number: 3:2020cv00069
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Distributed on 5/8/2020. (js)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal dismissing the #4 Complaint filed by Joshua Anthony Feist. (AS) Distributed on 5/8/2020 (js).
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Joshua Anthony Feist. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigations (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Joshua Anthony Feist. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS) Distributed on 4/30/2020 (js).
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Joshua Anthony Feist. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/13/2020. (cjs)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Anthony Feist. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feist v. Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Anthony Feist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?