Sinner et al v. Jaeger
Plaintiff: Lois Altenburg, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki and Elizabeth Jane Sinner
Defendant: Al Jaeger
Case Number: 3:2020cv00076
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (as)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Adopting #33 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner, Whitney Oxendahl, North Dakota Voters First, and Lois Altenburg by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (EA)
June 22, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Purdon, Timothy)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (MK)
June 8, 2020 Filing 31 SURREPLY to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Al Jaeger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miller v. Thurston, #2 Exhibit 2 - Arizonans for Fair Elections v Hobbs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Morgan v White, #4 Exhibit 4 - Fair Maps Nevada v Cegavske, #5 Exhibit 5 - Thompson v Dewine, #6 Exhibit 6 - Self Advocacy Solutions ND v Jaeger)(Phillips, David)
June 4, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2020 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner, Whitney Oxendahl, North Dakota Voters First, Lois Altenburg. (Court Reporter kk) (lh)
June 3, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Al Jaeger re #17 Response to Motion,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executive Order 2020-06.7)(Phillips, David)
June 3, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #27 NOTICE (Other). Clerks office added link to docket entry and added exhibit numbers to docket text. Clerks Office also removed double header from attachment/exhibit 1. (js)
June 3, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT Second Declaration of Amy Jacobson re #5 MEMORANDUM in Support,,,, by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Leeper, Simone)
June 2, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #20 REPLY to Response to Motion by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miller v. Thurston Opinion and Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Thompson v. DeWine Sixth Circuit Opinion)(Harless, Annabelle) Modified on 6/3/2020 to add link and exhibit numbers to docket text; Attachment 1 replaced on 6/3/2020 to remove double header - NEF Regenerated. (js)
May 28, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Al Jaeger.(Phillips, David)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Neil Weiner. (js)
May 27, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert N. Weiner (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-1959543) by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Weiner, Robert) Modified on 5/27/2020 to add receipt number to docket text. (js)
May 27, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte: Status Conference held on 5/27/2020. (DR #05272020 sinner v jaeger) (lh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing on #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2020 at 02:00 PM CT in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (EA)
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner re #20 Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Filing Corrected Declaration of Amy Jacobson (with attachments) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2: Corrected Jacobson Declaration (with attachments))(Gaber, Mark)
May 22, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Thompson v. DeWine Opinion & Order, #2 Exhibit 2: Jacobson Declaration)(Gaber, Mark)
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Counsel provided conference call dial-in information via e-mail. (EA)
May 21, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #17 Response to Motion. Clerk's Office added descriptions for Exhibits 1-17. (cjs)
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Gaber on behalf of Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner (Gaber, Mark)
May 20, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Al Jaeger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jaeger, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Jaeger-History of Initiative and Referendum, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Article III, ND Constitution, #4 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit of Jaeger-NDCC 16.1-01-09, #5 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Excerpts of Initiating Publication, #6 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit of Jaeger-2019-2021 Edition Table of Contents, #7 Exhibit 6 to Affidavit of Jaeger-2019-2021 Initiating and Referring Law in ND, #8 Exhibit 7 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Website excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Letter dated 3/6/2020, #10 Exhibit 9 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Letter dated 03/17/2020, #11 Exhibit 10 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Letter dated 04/30/2020, #12 Exhibit 11 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 12 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Letter acknowledging receipt, #14 Exhibit 13 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Voter postcards, #15 Exhibit 14 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Detailed guideline for review process, #16 Exhibit 15 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Worksheet and final tally sheet, #17 Exhibit 16 to Affidavit of Jaeger-Letter approving placement, #18 Exhibit 17 to Affidavit of Jaeger-NDCC 16.1-01-12, #19 Exhibit 18 - E.O. 2020-06.6, #20 Exhibit 19 - Order in New Approach v. MT, #21 Affidavit of Silrum)(Phillips, David) Modified on 5/21/2020 to add descriptions for Exhibits 1-17 (cjs).
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Simone Leeper. (rh)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Simone Leeper (Filing fee $150, receipt number BNDDC-1953822) by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Leeper, Simone) Modified on 5/18/2020 to add receipt number. (rh)
May 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 5/20/2020 Replies due by 5/22/2020. (rh)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #13 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule re #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Response is due by 5/20/2020. Reply is due by 5/22/2020. (LF)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule (Assented) by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Purdon, Timothy)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ruth Merewyn Greenwood; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Lamar. (cjs)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Sagsveen on behalf of Al Jaeger (Sagsveen, Matthew)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Phillips on behalf of Al Jaeger (Phillips, David)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher Lamar (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1950931) by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Lamar, Christopher) Modified on 5/7/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ruth Merewyn Greenwood (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1950942) by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Greenwood, Ruth) Modified on 5/7/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Annabelle Harless. (cjs)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued filed by Elizabeth Jane Sinner, Whitney Oxendahl, North Dakota Voters First, Carol Sawicki, Lois Altenburg. Al Jaeger served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Purdon, Timothy)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sawicki Delcaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - EO 2020-03, #3 Exhibit 3 - EO 2020-06, #4 Exhibit 4 - EO 2020-05, #5 Exhibit 5 - EO 2020-10, #6 Exhibit 6 - EO 2020-13, #7 Exhibit 7 - EO 2020-06.1, #8 Exhibit 8 - EO 2020.06.2, #9 Exhibit 9 - EO 2020.06.3, #10 Exhibit 10 - EO 2020-16, #11 Exhibit 11 - EO 2020-19, #12 Exhibit 12 - EO 2020-19.1, #13 Exhibit 13 - EO 2020-22, #14 Exhibit 14 - Dept of Health Order 2020-07, #15 Exhibit 15 - EO 2020-06.4, #16 Exhibit 16 - DND Admin. Order, #17 Exhibit 17 - ND Sup. Ct. Admin. Order, #18 Exhibit 18 - Oxendahl Declaration, #19 Exhibit 19 - Altenburg Declaration, #20 Exhibit 20 - Sinner Declaration, #21 Exhibit 21 - Quamme Declaration, #22 Exhibit 22 - Esshaki Opinion, #23 Exhibit 23 - Levy-Pollans Declaration)(Purdon, Timothy) (Attachment 22 replaced on 5/8/2020 to correct overlapping filing headers) (cjs). Regenerated on 5/8/2020 (cjs).
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner. (Purdon, Timothy)
May 7, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 COMPLAINT and #3 MOTION. Clerk's Office added North Dakota Voters First as Plaintiff to action. Party missed at time of case opening. North Dakota Voters First added as additional plaintiff of record. (pb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Annabelle E. Harless (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1950811) by Lois Altenburg, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Elizabeth Jane Sinner, North Dakota Voters First. (Harless, Annabelle) Modified to add additional party on 5/7/2020. NEF regenerated (pb). Modified on 5/7/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Al Jaeger. (js)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Al Jaeger (Filing fee $400, receipt number: 320000278) filed by Elizabeth Jane Sinner, Whitney Oxendahl, Carol Sawicki, Lois Altenburg, North Dakota Voters First. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js) Modified to add additional party on 5/7/2020. NEF regenerated (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinner et al v. Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Altenburg
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Oxendahl
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Sawicki
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Jane Sinner
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Timothy W. Billion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?