Petersen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dawn Ihnken Petersen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00077
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer and Administrative Record due 7/13/2020. (AS) Distributed on 6/10/2020 (pb).
June 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Wall, Sarah)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Defendant shall electronically file an answer and the administrative record by June 12, 2020. (LF) Distributed on 6/5/2020 (pb).
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wall, Sarah)
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Dawn Ihnken Petersen. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dawn Ihnken Petersen. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/21/2020. Distributed on 5/7/20. (rm)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from Middle District of Florida, Case Number 5:19-cv-628. Original file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the District of North Dakota. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 5/6/2020. (SC)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case "Opposed" by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF of service as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel by Dawn Ihnken Petersen. (RLK)
March 11, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF of service as to Office of Attorney General by Dawn Ihnken Petersen. (RLK)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Dawn Ihnken Petersen. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/5/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (RLK)
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RLK) Modified on 3/3/2020 (RLK).
March 3, 2020 Received completed summons and USM-285 forms. (RLK)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of change of address by Dawn Ihnken Petersen. (RLK)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Plaintiff to insert the correct name and address of each defendant and return to the Clerk the completed forms on or before February 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/7/2020. (SA)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER for pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/14/2020. (LMF)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dawn Ihnken Petersen. Related case(s): no. (RLK)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/20/2019. (SA)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 12/16/2019. (copy mailed to pro se plaintiff)(AKC)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/13/2019. (RLK)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Dawn Ihnken Petersen. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Dawn Ihnken Petersen. (no service copies provided)(RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petersen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Ihnken Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?