Red River Biorefinery, LLC v. NAES Corporation
Plaintiff: Red River Biorefinery, LLC
Defendant: NAES Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00109
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Counterclaim #19 by Red River Biorefinery, LLC.(Sand, Benjamin)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (LF)
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Red River Biorefinery, LLC by NAES Corporation.(Sandberg, Theodore)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Leslie A. Davis. (cjs)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Nelson Thomas. (js)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leslie A. Davis (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1986538) by Red River Biorefinery, LLC. (Davis, Leslie) Modified on 7/13/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven L. Strasberg. (js)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to NAES Corporation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/20/2020. (pb)
July 13, 2020 Deadlines terminated. NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to NAES Corporation is CANCELLED in light of Consent/Reassignment form being filed at #7 ; and case being reassigned at 9 . (js)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney John Nelson Thomas (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-1986071) by Red River Biorefinery, LLC. (Thomas, John) Modified on 7/10/2020 to add receipt #. (js)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven L. Strasberg (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-1986056) by Red River Biorefinery, LLC. (Strasberg, Steven) Modified on 7/10/2020 to add receipt #. (js)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor adopting #10 Stipulation to Dismiss Count II and Release of Bond Obligations; and finding as moot #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Count II of the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (CK)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Count III and Release of Bond Obligations by Red River Biorefinery, LLC. (Sand, Benjamin)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all furtherproceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, no longer assigned as presiding judge.(js)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Red River Biorefinery, LLC (Sand, Benjamin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Red River Biorefinery, LLC. (js)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Red River Biorefinery, LLC. (Sand, Benjamin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Red River Biorefinery, LLC. (Sand, Benjamin)
June 29, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's office corrected parties to Other Affiliate and added the correct Corporate Parent. (rh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Red River Biorefinery, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/10/2020. (js)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to NAES Corporation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/10/2020. (js)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NAES Corporation identifying Other Affiliate ITOCHU International Inc., Other Affiliate I-Power Investment, Corporate Parent ITOCHU Corporation for NAES Corporation. (js) Modified on 6/29/2020 to correct other affiliates and add corporate parent. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NAES Corporation from Grand Forks County District Court, case number 18-2020-CV-01396. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 320000329 filed by NAES Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - O&M Services Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Keshav Rajpal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Default, #7 Exhibit 7 - Employee Termination, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Termination, #9 Exhibit 9 - Proposed Complaint for Declaratory Judgement, Injunctive Relief, and Monetary Damages, #10 Exhibit 10 - O&M Services Agreement, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Default, #12 Exhibit 12 - NAES Demand, #13 Exhibit 13 - Employee Termination, #14 Exhibit 14 - Notice of Termination, #15 Exhibit 15 - Affidavit of Attorney Benjamin Sand in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Temporary Restraining Order filed by Benjamin Sand (Not Signed), #17 Exhibit 17 - Certificate of Service on NAES Corporation, Norm Escover, David Miner, Royd Warren, and Clay Thornton, #18 Exhibit 18 - Notice of Assignment and Case Number, #19 Exhibit 19 - Temporary Restraining Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - Notice of Hearing, #21 Exhibit 21 - Summons, #22 Exhibit 22 - Complaint for Declaratory Judgement, Injunctive Relief, and Monetary Damages, #23 Exhibit 23 - O&M Services Agreement, #24 Exhibit 24 - Notice of Default, #25 Exhibit 25 - NAES Demand, #26 Exhibit 26 - Employee Termination, #27 Exhibit 27 - Notice of Termination, #28 Exhibit 28 - COS on NAES Corporation, Norm Escover, David Miner, Royd Warren, and Clay Thornton, #29 Exhibit 29 - Plaintiffs Written Undertaking on Temporary Restraining Order Bond, #30 Exhibit 30 - Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #31 Exhibit 31 - Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #32 Exhibit 32 - Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #33 Exhibit 33 - Exhibit A to Brief Affidavit of Keshav Rajpal, #34 Exhibit 34 - Proposed Preliminary Injunction, #35 Exhibit 35 - COS on NAES Corporation, Norm Escover, David Miner, Royd Warren, and Clay Thornton, #36 Exhibit 36 - Affidavit of Service on NAES Corporation, #37 Exhibit 37 - ND Secretary of State Business Search (Red River Biorefinery, LLC), #38 Exhibit 38 - ND Secretary of State Business Search (NAES Corporation), #39 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red River Biorefinery, LLC v. NAES Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAES Corporation
Represented By: Theodore T. Sandberg
Represented By: Jessie Leigh VanCamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red River Biorefinery, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Leslie Davis
Represented By: Steven L. Strasberg
Represented By: John N. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?