Smith v. Fresh Express Incorporated
Plaintiff: Shane G. Smith
Defendant: Fresh Express Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv00117
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (pb)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte Adopting #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Shane G. Smith. (MK)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shane G. Smith (Brost, Ashley)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane G. Smith. Fresh Express Incorporated served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020 (Brost, Ashley)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William D. Marler. (js)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney William D. Marler (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-1986243) by Shane G. Smith. (Marler, William) Modified on 7/13/2020 to add receipt #. (js)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fresh Express Incorporated. (pb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fresh Express Incorporated (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000342) filed by Shane G. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Fresh Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane G. Smith
Represented By: Ashley R Brost
Represented By: William Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?