25th Street Group Apartments #1, LLC v. Bremer Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: 25th Street Group Apartments #1, LLC
Defendant: Bremer Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2020cv00167
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2022 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial Est. 5 Days).(AKS)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Discovery Motions due by 4/19/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/19/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/18/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 6/18/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 6/18/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/3/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 11/29/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 4/1/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 4/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/3/2021. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AKS) Modified on 10/13/2020 to correct date of mid-discovery status conference in docket text - NEF Regenerated. (js)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.(AKS) Modified to correct docket text on 10/14/2020. NEF regenerated (pb).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.(AKS)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 10/9/2020. (lc)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.(AKS)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation for Protective Order and Proposed Order by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.(AKS)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 25th Street Group Apartments #1, LLC re #6 Stipulation (Hanson, Mark)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Protective Order and Proposed Order by 25th Street Group Apartments #1, LLC. (Hanson, Mark)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 25th Street Group Apartments #1, LLC re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Hanson, Mark)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 25th Street Group Apartments #1, LLC. (Hanson, Mark)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bremer Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Bremer Financial Corporation, a Minnesota corporation for Bremer Bank, National Association.. (pb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bremer Bank, National Association from Cass County District Court, case number 09-2020-cv-02694. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 320000427 filed by Bremer Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint & Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit C - Admission of Service, #5 Exhibit D - Defendant's Answer to the Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service for Answer to Complaint, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Assignment & Case Number, #8 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service for Notice of Assignment & Case Number, #9 Affidavit of Service)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 25th Street Group Apartments #1, LLC v. Bremer Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 25th Street Group Apartments #1, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bremer Bank, National Association
Represented By: Ryan C. McCamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?