Patel v. Novacek et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Patel
Defendant: Fargo, City of, Travis Moser and Jon Novacek
Case Number: 3:2020cv00180
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 12/29/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 12/17/2020). See written instructions at Doc. #13 . (AS)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Fargo, City of, Travis Moser, Jon Novacek.(Gaustad, Daniel)
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fargo, City of, Travis Moser, Jon Novacek.(Gaustad, Daniel)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #9 Stipulation filed by Fargo, City of, Travis Moser, Jon Novacek. Defendants' answer due 11/16/20. (AKS)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Fargo, City of, Travis Moser, Jon Novacek. (Quinn, Joseph)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte and referring to Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(mf)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Fargo, City of, Travis Moser, Jon Novacek. (mf)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Gaustad on behalf of All Defendants (Gaustad, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants filed by Tyler Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined edits)(Newville, Joshua)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Tyler Patel. (pb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Tyler Patel. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/16/2020. (pb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fargo, City of, Travis Moser, Jon Novacek. (pb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fargo, City of, Travis Moser, Jon Novacek (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000459) filed by Tyler Patel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Novacek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo, City of
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Moser
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Novacek
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Patel
Represented By: Joshua A. Newville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?