Horner v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Malena Horner
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv00182
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration served on 10/22/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Schneider, McLain) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/28/2020 to shrink document and make header visible). NEF regenerated.(sj).
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (pb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Social Security Administration. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/3/2020. (pb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Wall, Sarah)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sj)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Malena Horner. (pb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Malena Horner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sj)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AKS)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Malena Horner. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/21/2020. (js)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Malena Horner. (Attachments: #1 proposed Complaint and JS44)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horner v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malena Horner
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?