Bennett v. Martin
Plaintiff: Jexenia Bennett
Defendant: Guy Martin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00030
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Guy Martin.(Harrie, William)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #3 Stipulation for an extension of time. Defendant's answer due by 3/31/2021. (AS)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION For Extension to File Answer by Guy Martin. (Harrie, William)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Guy Martin. (js)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guy Martin (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000152) filed by Jexenia Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jexenia Bennett
Represented By: James M. Loren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Martin
Represented By: William P. Harrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?