Meidinger et al v. Zoetis, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tyler Meidinger, Curt Meidinger, Peggy Meidinger and Trevor Meidinger
Defendant: Zoetis, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00097
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (pb)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Adopting #38 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Curt Meidinger by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (EA)
October 28, 2022 Filing 38 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Curt Meidinger. (Zuger, Peter)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Two business days prior to the Final Pretrial Conference, counsel must email the Final Pretrial Statement; Exhibit List and Witness List for each party; and Expert Reports to ndd_J-Senechal@ndd.uscourts.gov. Trial Memorandum due at least 7 days prior to trial. Deposition designations due at least 14 days prior to trial. Additional deposition designations by opposing parties due 7 days prior to trial. Objections to deposition designations due 4 days prior to trial. Jury Instructions due at least 7 days prior to trial. Motions in limine due 30 days prior to trial. Additional deadlines and details contained in the Order. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/23/2023 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 06/27/2023). (KT) Modified to add docket text per chambers on 10/28/2022. NEF regenerated. (sc).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte granting #14 Partial Motion to Dismiss. (EA)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference RESET for 1/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 7/7/2022). See written instructions at Doc. #24 . (AS)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #33 Stipulation to amend the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/1/2022. Discovery Motions due by 8/15/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/3/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 10/21/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 12/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2023. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/27/2023 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 1/10/2023). Pretrial Conference RESET for 7/11/2023 at 09:00 AM and Jury Trial RESET for 7/11/2023 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Previously set for 1/24/2023). (Trial Est. 7-10 Days). (AS)
January 20, 2022 Filing 33 STIPULATION re #23 Scheduling Order,,, by Curt Meidinger, Peggy Meidinger, Trevor Meidinger, Tyler Meidinger. (Zuger, Peter)
January 18, 2022 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Mid-Discovery Status Conference held on 1/18/2022. (DR #220118-000.mp3 (JS Chambers Recorder)) (js)
January 12, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference RESET for 1/18/2022 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for for 1/26/2022). Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
December 2, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference RESET for 1/26/2022 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 1/19/2022). Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #27 Stipulation for entry of a Protective Order. (AS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Zoetis, Inc.. (Blum, Joseph)
September 8, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 1/24/2023 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial Est. 7-10 Days). (AS)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 2/15/2022. Discovery Motions due by 2/25/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/1/2022. Any Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 4/22/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 6/30/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 11/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2022. A Mid-Discovery Status Conference is set for 1/19/2022 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS) (Main Document 23 replaced on 9/8/2021 to remove blank page 5 - NEF Regenerated). (js)
September 8, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 9/8/2021. (DR #210908-000.mp3 (JS Chambers Recorder)) (js)
August 19, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Zoetis, Inc.. (Blum, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #19 Brief. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Response to Motion at #20 (mf)
August 5, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Curt Meidinger, Peggy Meidinger, Trevor Meidinger, Tyler Meidinger. (mf)
August 5, 2021 Filing 19 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Curt Meidinger, Peggy Meidinger, Trevor Meidinger, Tyler Meidinger. (Zuger, Peter) Modified on 8/6/2021 to restrict access (mf)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolutions of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AKS)
July 30, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Zoetis, Inc..(Hanson, Mark)
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoetis, Inc. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiffs' Complaint, #15 MEMORANDUM in Support (Hanson, Mark)
July 16, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Zoetis, Inc.. (Hanson, Mark)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Zoetis, Inc.. (Hanson, Mark)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert B. Stock withdrawn from case. (AS)
July 15, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Document should have been filed as a motion. Clerk's Office corrected event from NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and regenerated the NEF. (pb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert B. Stock on behalf of Zoetis, Inc. (Stock, Robert) Modified to correct event on 7/15/2021. NEF regenerated (pb).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph H. Blum; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean P. Wajert; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney LaRae' C. Neal. (js)
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney LaRae' C. Neal (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2214664) by Zoetis, Inc. (Neal, LaRae) Modified on 7/14/2021 to add receipt number. (js)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sean P. Wajert (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2214658) by Zoetis, Inc. (Wajert, Sean) Modified on 7/14/2021 to add receipt number. (js)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph H. Blum (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2214650) by Zoetis, Inc. (Blum, Joseph) Modified on 7/14/2021 to add receipt number. (js)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoetis, Inc. re #6 Notice of Appearance (Hanson, Mark)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Hanson on behalf of Zoetis, Inc. (Hanson, Mark)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Todd D. Wilkinson. (js)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Todd D Wilkinson (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2195160) by Curt Meidinger, Peggy Meidinger, Trevor Meidinger, Tyler Meidinger. (Wilkinson, Todd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/10/2021 with non-fillable pdf) (js). Regenerated on 6/10/2021 (cjs).
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Stock on behalf of Zoetis, Inc. (Stock, Robert)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Zoetis, Inc. (pb)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zoetis, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000271) filed by Peggy Meidinger, Curt Meidinger, Tyler Meidinger, Trevor Meidinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meidinger et al v. Zoetis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Meidinger
Represented By: Peter W. Zuger
Represented By: Morgan Lyn Croaker
Represented By: Todd D Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curt Meidinger
Represented By: Peter W. Zuger
Represented By: Morgan Lyn Croaker
Represented By: Todd D Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Meidinger
Represented By: Peter W. Zuger
Represented By: Morgan Lyn Croaker
Represented By: Todd D Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Meidinger
Represented By: Peter W. Zuger
Represented By: Morgan Lyn Croaker
Represented By: Todd D Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoetis, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Represented By: Anthony J. Anderson
Represented By: Joseph H. Blum
Represented By: LaRae Neal
Represented By: Sean Peter Wajert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?