olson v. ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2 et al
Plaintiff: kevin lee olson
Defendant: ND OMB RM DIRECTOR, ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2, ND LEGISLATURE and ND GOVERNOR
Case Number: 3:2021cv00108
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ND GOVERNOR, ND LEGISLATURE, ND OMB RM DIRECTOR, ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2 re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MEMORANDUM in Support (O'Neill, Seth)
July 1, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ND GOVERNOR, ND LEGISLATURE, ND OMB RM DIRECTOR, ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2. (O'Neill, Seth)
July 1, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ND GOVERNOR, ND LEGISLATURE, ND OMB RM DIRECTOR, ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2. (O'Neill, Seth)
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ND GOVERNOR, ND LEGISLATURE, ND OMB RM DIRECTOR, ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2 re #16 Notice of Appearance (O'Neill, Seth)
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth O'Neill on behalf of All Defendants (O'Neill, Seth)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by kevin lee olson re #3 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, Page 2 of 2; Doc 3, #2 Carbon Copy of Check for Payment, #3 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #13 COURT NOTIFICATION PROOF OF SERVICE filed by kevin lee olson. (AS) Distributed on 6/9/2021 (js).
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 COURT NOTIFICATION PROOF OF SERVICE by kevin lee olson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal regarding service. (AS) Distributed on 6/2/2021 (js).
June 1, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 Certificate of Service. Clerk's office added link to entry #10 NOTICE of Change of Address (Corrected Address). (rh)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (to ND GOVERNOR) by kevin lee olson re #1 Complaint, #10 NOTICE of Change of Address (Corrected Address) (pb) Modified on 6/1/2021 to add link to #10 . (rh)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address (Corrected Address) by kevin lee olson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(pb)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb) Distributed on 5/28/2021 (pb).
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by kevin lee olson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(pb)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Kevin Olson re: Service. (js)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by kevin lee olson re #5 Summons Returned Executed (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by kevin lee olson. ND OMB RM DIRECTOR served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021; ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2 served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Notice of Direct Assignment. Mail (Notice of Direct Assignment and Summons) resent to Kevin Lee Olson. (sj) Modified on 5/24/2021 to add document to entry. NEF regenerated. (sj).
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ND GOVERNOR, ND LEGISLATURE, ND OMB RM DIRECTOR, ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2. (sj)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to kevin lee olson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/1/2021. (sj)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ND GOVERNOR, ND LEGISLATURE, ND OMB RM DIRECTOR, ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2 (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000295) filed by kevin lee olson. (Attachments: #1 Doc 1.1 October 24, 2019 Unexpected Traumatic Amputations, #2 Doc 1.2 WSI Staff as Defendants, #3 Doc 1.3 First State Risk Management Fund Notice of Claim to ND, #4 Doc 1.4 Second Notice of Claim to ND, #5 Doc 1.5 Supplemental Doc to Doc 1.4 (Second Notice of Claim to ND), #6 Doc 1.6 January 26, 2021 Response to WSI Notice of Award, #7 Doc 1.7 ND Century Code; Claims and Compensation, #8 Doc 1.8 ND Century Code; Claims Against the State, #9 Doc 1.9 ND Century Code; Workforce Safety and Insurance, #10 Doc 1.10 ND OMB Liability of State Employees, #11 Doc 1.11 Vail v. SL Services Inc, #12 Doc 1.12 OSHA Safeguarding Equipment and Protecting Employees from Amputations Manual, #13 Doc 1.13 OSHA News Release Region 8, #14 Doc 1.14 First Report of Injury Dated: October 25, 2019, #15 Doc 1.15 Detailed Recollection of Accident, #16 Doc 1.16 MST Communications, #17 Doc 1.17 WSI & PPI Agent Communications, #18 Doc 1.18 ND WSI Award Communications, #19 Doc 1.19 ND OMB Communications, #20 Doc 1.20 Physicians Notes X-Rays/Surgeries, #21 Doc 1.21 Quick Dash Activity Difficulty Assessment, #22 Doc 1.22 OSHA Standard Interpretations Amputations Defined, #23 Doc 1.23 ND Century Code; Prevention of Injuries, #24 Certificate of Service, #25 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: olson v. ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: kevin lee olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ND OMB RM DIRECTOR
Represented By: Seth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ND WSI & STAFF DOC 1.2
Represented By: Seth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ND LEGISLATURE
Represented By: Seth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ND GOVERNOR
Represented By: Seth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?