Loggins v. Fargo Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan David Loggins
Defendant: Petro Serv USA and Fargo Police Department
Case Number: 3:2021cv00121
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan David Loggins (Attachments: #1 Correspondence re Personal Mail to NDSP, #2 Mailing Envelope)(js)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Jonathan Loggins (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (js)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Distributed on 6/29/2021.(js)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal dismissing the #8 Complaint filed by Jonathan David Loggins. (AS) Distributed on 6/29/2021 (js).
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jonathan David Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Fargo Police Department, Petro Serv USA (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Jonathan David Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to Cass County Jail re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. Distributed on 6/17/2021. (js)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; finding as moot #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (AS) Distributed on 6/17/2021 (js).
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jonathan David Loggins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/30/2021. (jb) Distributed on 6/16/2021. (jb)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Fargo Police Department, #3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons-Petro Serv USA, #4 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan David Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Inmate Account to Assets by Jonathan David Loggins. (mf) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/16/2021 to attach correct document) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2021: #1 Mailing Envelope) Regenerated NEF (mf).
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loggins v. Fargo Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Serv USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan David Loggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?