Heinle v. Lake Region Law Enforcement Center et al
Plaintiff: Roger Heinle
Defendant: Justin Smith, Dr. Jacquelyn Downs, John and jane Does 1 through 10, Rob Johnson, Lake Region Law Enforcement Center, Joylynn Deshaw and Tammie Roed
Case Number: 3:2021cv00134
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (sj)
July 15, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Joylynn Deshaw, Jacquelyn Downs, Rob Johnson, Lake Region Law Enforcement Center, Tammie Roed, Justin Smith. (sj)
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Justin Smith. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/26/2021. (cjs)
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Tammie Roed. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/26/2021. (cjs)
July 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lake Region Law Enforcement Center. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/26/2021. (cjs)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Rob Johnson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/26/2021. (cjs)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jacquelyn Downs. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/26/2021. (cjs)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Joylynn Deshaw. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/26/2021. (cjs)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Justin Smith. Justin Smith waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Gaustad, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tammie Roed. Tammie Roed waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Gaustad, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lake Region Law Enforcement Center. Lake Region Law Enforcement Center waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Gaustad, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rob Johnson. Rob Johnson waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Gaustad, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacquelyn Downs. Jacquelyn Downs waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Gaustad, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joylynn Deshaw. Joylynn Deshaw waiver sent on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Gaustad, Daniel)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Gaustad on behalf of Joylynn Deshaw, Jacquelyn Downs, Rob Johnson, Lake Region Law Enforcement Center, Tammie Roed, Justin Smith (Gaustad, Daniel)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Roger Heinle. (js)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Roger Heinle. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/13/2021. (js)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Roger Heinle. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/30/2021. (pb)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joylynn Deshaw, John and jane Does 1 through 10, Jacquelyn Downs, Rob Johnson, Lake Region Law Enforcement Center, Tammie Roed, Justin Smith. (pb)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joylynn Deshaw, John and jane Does 1 through 10, Jacquelyn Downs, Rob Johnson, Lake Region Law Enforcement Center, Tammie Roed, Justin Smith (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000339) filed by Roger Heinle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heinle v. Lake Region Law Enforcement Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Heinle
Represented By: Vincent J. Moccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Smith
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jacquelyn Downs
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and jane Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Johnson
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Region Law Enforcement Center
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joylynn Deshaw
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammie Roed
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?