Loggins v. City of Fargo et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan David Loggins
Defendant: City of Fargo and Cass County
Case Number: 3:2021cv00149
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (AS) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/15/2021 to correct a typographical error per Chambers). Order distributed. (sj).
July 15, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. See Order at #5 . (pb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jonathan David Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44, #2 (Cass County) Request for Waiver of Service Dated 7/7/2021, #3 (Cass County) Request for Waiver of Service Dated 6/9/2021, #4 (City of Fargo) Request for Waiver of Service Dated 6/9/2021, #5 Mailing Envelope Received in Bismarck, #6 Mailing Envelope Received in Fargo)(sj)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan David Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loggins v. City of Fargo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan David Loggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?