Brenner v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Stacy Brenner
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv00227
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (pb)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Social Security Administration. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/9/2022. (pb)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Wall, Sarah)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Stacy Brenner. (sj)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pb)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Stacy Brenner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (KT)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Stacy Brenner. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 1/12/2022. (sj)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stacy Brenner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brenner v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Brenner
Represented By: Scott A. Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?