Friederichs v. Sanford Health
Plaintiff: Matthew G. Friederichs, M.D.
Defendant: Sanford Health
Case Number: 3:2022cv00008
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 3/18/2022. (DR #220318-000 JS Chambers Recorder) (lc)
March 18, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial Est. 5-8 Days). (AS)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2023 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 6/2/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 11/1/2022. Discovery Motions due by 11/15/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/16/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/16/2022. Any Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 1/3/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 1/17/2023. Join Additional Parties due by 6/1/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2022. Nondispositive Motions due by 6/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/6/2023. Status Conference set for 5/13/2022 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #34 Stipulation re: ESI Protocol. (AS)
March 18, 2022 Filing 34 STIPULATION and Proposed ESI Protocol by Sanford Health. (sj)
March 17, 2022 Filing 33 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Wheeler, Brandon)
February 14, 2022 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte: Status Conference held on 2/14/2022. (DR #220214-000friederichs) (lh)
February 14, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #31 AFFIDAVIT. Clerk's Office removed duplicative 'exhibit' reference in attachments. (pb)
February 13, 2022 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT re #24 Order Adopting Stipulation by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mangin email, #2 Exhibit B - Erickson email)(Wheeler, Brandon) Modified to remove duplicative 'exhibit' on 2/14/2022 (pb).
February 11, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/14/2022 at 08:30 AM by telephone before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Counsel provided conference call dial-in information via email. (EA)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2022 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (KT)
February 10, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sanford Health.(Raiter, Shawn)
February 10, 2022 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanford Health. (Raiter, Shawn)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte finding as moot #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and finding as moot #7 Motion to Expedite in light of #25 Affidavit of Darren Huber and #24 Order Adopting Stipulation. (EA)
February 9, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF DARREN HUBER by Sanford Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter)(Raiter, Shawn)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Adopting #23 Stipulation filed by Matthew G. Friederichs, M.D. by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (EA)
February 4, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #23 STIPULATION. Clerk's Office added exhibit letter to attachment. (pb)
February 4, 2022 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Motion Hearing re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order previously set for 2/4/2022 in Fargo Courtroom 1 is CANCELLED in light of #23 Stipulation. (EA)
February 3, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Letter)(Wheeler, Brandon) Modified to add exhibit letter on 2/4/2022 (pb).
February 2, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Mary Vetter re #17 Reply to Response to Motion by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Wheeler, Brandon)
February 2, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey Lystad re #17 Reply to Response to Motion by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sanford Letter re Lystad)(Wheeler, Brandon)
February 2, 2022 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Jason Erpelding, M.D. re #17 Reply to Response to Motion by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sanford Letter re Erpelding)(Wheeler, Brandon)
February 2, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew G. Friederichs, M.D. (Second) re #17 Reply to Response to Motion by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Picture of Contact Information)(Wheeler, Brandon)
February 2, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Brandon J. Wheeler (Second) re #17 Reply to Response to Motion by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Email from Mr. Raiter, #2 Exhibit G - Draft Joint Letter, #3 Exhibit H - Draft Solo Letter)(Wheeler, Brandon)
February 2, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Wheeler, Brandon)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff may file his reply brief with an additional ten (10) pages. (EA)
February 2, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Wheeler, Brandon)
January 31, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #13 Response to Motion by Sanford Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ND SOS Business Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Trademark filings in the US Patent and Trademark Office, #3 Exhibit C - NPI information for Matthew Friederichs MD PLLC, #4 Exhibit D - NPI information for OrthoDakota (Jason Erpelding MD PLLC), #5 Exhibit E - 1-25-2022 email from Shawn Raiter to Dan Kelly, #6 Exhibit F - Joint letter proposed by counsel for Dr. Friederichs, #7 Exhibit G - Sanford's revised proposed joint letter)(Raiter, Shawn) Exhibits A, B, and D replaced on 2/1/2022 to remove overlapping headers and cleaned up exhibit docket text. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sanford Health. (Raiter, Shawn)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (EA)
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Beranek Brandt on behalf of Sanford Health (Brandt, Angela)
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn M. Raiter on behalf of Sanford Health (Raiter, Shawn)
January 21, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sanford Health answer due 2/10/2022.
January 21, 2022 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated as to answer due date for Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (mf)
January 21, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Summons Returned Executed. Clerk's Office corrected party served and answer due date. Re: #9 Certificate of Service. Clerk's Office added links. (mf)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 MEMORANDUM in Support, #5 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Matthew G. Friederichs, M.D., #6 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Brandon J. Wheeler, #7 MOTION to Expedite Hearing (Wheeler, Brandon) Modified on 1/21/2022 to add additional links (mf)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. Sanford Health served on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022 (Wheeler, Brandon) Modified on 1/21/2022 to correct party served (mf)
January 20, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew G. Friederichs, M.D. and #6 Affidavit Declaration of Brandon J. Wheeler. Clerk's office added descriptions to exhibits. (jb)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Wheeler, Brandon)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Brandon J. Wheeler by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Sanford Health dated December 13, 2021, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Sanford Health dated January 12, 2022, #3 Exhibit C - Patient Bill of Rights, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's First Set of Request for Production of Documents)(Wheeler, Brandon) Modified on 1/20/2022 to add exhibit descriptions. (jb)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT Declararion of Matthew G. Friederichs, M.D. by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Sanford)(Wheeler, Brandon) Modified on 1/20/2022 to add exhibit descriptions. (jb)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Wheeler, Brandon)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Wheeler, Brandon)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sanford Health. (pb)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sanford Health (Filing fee $402, receipt number 322000121) filed by Matthew G. Friederichs, MD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friederichs v. Sanford Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew G. Friederichs, M.D.
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: David L. Hashmall
Represented By: Daniel Robert Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Health
Represented By: Angela Beranek Brandt
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?