Amundson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Heidi Amundson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv00068
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (pb) (Main Document 8 replaced with correct document on 4/28/2022. NEF regenerated) (pb).
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Wall, Sarah)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (js)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Heidi Amundson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Heidi Amundson. (pb)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (KT)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Heidi Amundson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/4/2022. (sj)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heidi Amundson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amundson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Amundson
Represented By: Scott A. Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?