Rainey v. City of Fargo et al
Plaintiff: Dione Rainey
Defendant: City of Fargo, Fargo Police Department, Det. Witte, Det. Holte, Cass County State's Attorney Office, Tracy Gompf, Cass County Human Services and Heidee Hill
Case Number: 3:2022cv00112
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Dione Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
July 18, 2022 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dione Rainey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/25/2022. (sj)
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 REDACTION to #4 Complaint: Attachment 2 - Letter from Cass County Human Service Zone Dated: October 18, 2021 by Dione Rainey. (sj)
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 REDACTION to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dione Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Letter from Cass County Human Service Zone Dated: October 18, 2021)(sj)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal directing the Clerk to seal and file redacted copies of certain documents. (AS) Distributed on 7/1/2022 (sj).
June 30, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Cass County Human Services, Cass County State's Attorney Office, City of Fargo, Fargo Police Department, Tracy Gompf, Heidee Hill, Det. Holte, Det. Witte (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Dione Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 *SEALED* Letter from Cass County Human Service Zone Dated: October 18, 2021, #3 Letter from City of Fargo Police Department Dated: July 26, 2021, #4 Exhibit A & B - Fargo Police Department Documentation (Search Warrant), #5 Cass County Search Warrant, #6 Child Protection Services Intake Form, #7 Fargo Police Department Summary Report Dated July 1, 2021 with attachments, #8 Cass County Information)(pb) Modified on 7/1/2022 to seal document per Order at #5 . (sj).
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (KT) Distributed on 6/30/2022 (pb).
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dione Rainey. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/14/2022. (sj)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1 *SEALED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dione Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 *SEALED* Letter from Cass County Human Service Zone Dated: October 18, 2021, #4 Letter from City of Fargo Police Department Dated: July 26, 2021, #5 Exhibit A & B - Fargo Police Department Documentation (Search Warrant), #6 Cass County Search Warrant, #7 Child Protection Services Intake Form, #8 Fargo Police Department Summary Report Dated July 1, 2021 with attachments, #9 Cass County Information)(sj) Modified on 7/1/2022 to seal documents per Order at #5 . (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainey v. City of Fargo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dione Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Holte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County State's Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Gompf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidee Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?