United States of America v. Tronson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Darren Wade Tronson and DL Farms LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00120
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/15/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 9/13/2022). See written order at Doc. #7 . (KT)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (KT)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by DL Farms LLC, Darren Wade Tronson.(Donarski, Michelle)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Donarski on behalf of DL Farms LLC, Darren Wade Tronson (Donarski, Michelle)
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #3 Summons Returned Executed, (Schoepf, Michael)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. DL Farms LLC served on 7/18/2022, answer due 8/8/2022; Darren Wade Tronson served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Return Receipts)(Schoepf, Michael)
July 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DL Farms LLC, Darren Wade Tronson. (sj)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DL Farms LLC, Darren Wade Tronson (Filing Fee: Waived) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 2018 Application Grand Forks, #3 Exhibit B - 2018 Application Traill, #4 Exhibit C - 2017 Acreage Report Grand Forks, #5 Exhibit D - 2017 Notice of Loss Grand Forks, #6 Exhibit E - 2017 Production Worksheet Grand Forks, #7 Exhibit F - 2018 Acreage Report Grand Forks, #8 Exhibit G - 2018 Notice of Loss Grand Forks, #9 Exhibit H - 2018 Production Worksheets Grand Forks, #10 Exhibit I - 2018 Acreage Report Traill, #11 Exhibit J - 2018 Notice of Loss Traill, #12 Exhibit K - 2018 Production Worksheet Traill)(sj) Modified on 7/15/2022 to add 'Exhibit' to attachment 12. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tronson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Wade Tronson
Represented By: Matthew D. Kirschenmann
Represented By: Michelle M. Donarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DL Farms LLC
Represented By: Matthew D. Kirschenmann
Represented By: Michelle M. Donarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?