Ketterling v. Braaten
Plaintiff: Joshua Ketterling
Defendant: Brian Braaten
Case Number: 3:2022cv00122
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (TEXT ONLY) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 9/22/2022). See written order at Doc. #12 . (KT) Modified on 8/24/2022 to add 'text only' language. NEF regenerated (pb).
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (KT)
August 18, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Brian Braaten.(Weir, Jordan)
August 11, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Brian Braaten. (sj)
August 11, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Joshua Ketterling. (sj)
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Brian Braaten. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/22/2022. (sj)
August 8, 2022 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Joshua Ketterling. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/15/2022. (pb)
August 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan B. Weir on behalf of Brian Braaten (Weir, Jordan)
July 29, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 Acknowledgement of Service. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Summons Returned Executed at #5 . (cjs)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Ketterling. (cjs)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint filed by Joshua Ketterling. Brian Braaten served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Weikum, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/29/2022 to restrict access (cjs).
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Joshua Ketterling. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/1/2022. (mf)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brian Braaten. (mf)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Braaten (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000178) filed by Joshua Ketterling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ketterling v. Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ketterling
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Braaten
Represented By: Jordan B. Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?