Short v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Richard Short
Defendant: United States of America, Bureau of Indian Affairs and Alan Blue
Case Number: 3:2022cv00147
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due by 12/29/2022. (AS)
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint /STIPULATED by Bureau of Indian Affairs, United States of America. (Iversen, Tara)
October 27, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bureau of Indian Affairs answer due 11/28/2022. (cjs)
October 26, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Indian Affairs served on 9/28/2022, answer due 11/28/2022 (Larson, Mark) Modified on 10/27/2022 to add information for party served as well as service and answer due dates. Regenerated NEF (cjs).
October 13, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Affidavit of Service. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Summons Returned Executed as to USA at #12 (mf)
October 12, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Indian Affairs served on 9/26/2022, answer due 11/25/2022; United States of America served on 9/26/2022, answer due 11/25/2022. (mf)
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alan Blue re #10 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Alan Blue (Lamb, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Alan Blue.(Lamb, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Filing 9 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* AFFIDAVIT of Service re #2 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint by Richard Short. (Larson, Mark) Modified on 10/13/2022 to restrict access (mf)
September 27, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as #8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED AS TO USA. (sj)
September 26, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Indian Affairs served on 9/14/2022, answer due 11/13/2022; United States of America served on 9/14/2022, answer due 11/13/2022. (sj)
September 26, 2022 Filing 7 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Short. Bureau of Indian Affairs served on 9/14/2022, answer due 10/5/2022; United States of America served on 9/14/2022, answer due 10/5/2022 (Larson, Mark) Modified on 9/27/2022 to restrict access. (sj).
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Short. Alan Blue served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022 (Larson, Mark)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (sc)
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Richard Short. (sc)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Richard Short. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/21/2022. (sj)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alan Blue, Bureau of Indian Affairs, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sj)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alan Blue, Bureau of Indian Affairs, United States of America (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000133) filed by Richard Short. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Short
Represented By: Anders Larson
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Represented By: Shelby Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Represented By: Tara V. Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Represented By: Tara V. Iversen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Blue
Represented By: Timothy Charles Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?