Peto v. Future Motion, INC., a California Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bronson Peto
Defendant: Future Motion, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00217
Filed: October 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte Adopting #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bronson Peto. (KT) (Main Document 6 replaced to correct error in document document on 11/25/2024. NEF regenerated) (pb).
November 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bronson Peto (Rick, Anna)
November 5, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bronson Peto. Scheels All Sports, Inc. served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024 (Rick, Anna) (Main Document 4 replaced to correct overlapping headers on 11/6/2024) (sl). NEF regenerated on 11/6/2024 (sl).
November 5, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bronson Peto. Future Motion, Inc. served on 10/29/2024, answer due 11/19/2024 (Rick, Anna)
October 28, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Future Motion, INC., a California Corporation and Scheels All Sports INC., a North Dakota Corporation. (bl)
October 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Future Motion, INC., a California Corporation, Scheels All Sports INC., a North Dakota Corporation (Filing fee $405, receipt number 300001014) filed by Bronson Peto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - CPSCs Warning 11/16/22, #3 Exhibit B - Commissioner Trumkas Statement 11/16/22, #4 Exhibit C - Future Motion Responds to the CPSCs Unjustified and Alarmist Claims Regarding Onewheels dated 11/16/22, #5 Exhibit D - Onewheel Community Delivers over 4,000 Letters to CPSC Defending the Right to Let Us Ride!' dated 11/21/22, #6 Exhibit E - CPSC Recall dated September 29, 2023, #7 Summons FM, #8 Summons Scheels)(bl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peto v. Future Motion, INC., a California Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bronson Peto
Represented By: Anna Rick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Motion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?