Knight v. Vondal

Plaintiff: Richard Knight
Defendant: Darren Vondal
Case Number: 4:2013cv00004
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Rolette
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT)
June 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2014 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 12, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2014 and trial set for 9/03/2014 are cancelled with the understanding that they will be rescheduled as necessary at a future date. The parties are to submit status reports to the court by 9/12/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 8/12/2014 to correct date status reports are due. Regenerated NEF. (rh) Distributed to both plaintiff and defendant on 8/12/2014. (rh)
October 3, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's response to defendant's 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due by 10/24/2014. Defendant's reply due by 10/31/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Vondal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Knight
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Vondal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.