Ross Eriksmoen, Inc. v. Continental Resources, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ross Eriksmoen, Inc.
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00107
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Divide
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Protective Order. (KT)
June 19, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Additional Pretrial Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/16/2015. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/1/2015. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/1/2015. Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/8/2016. Expert Depositions due by 2/15/2016. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
April 3, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Trial and Final Pretrial Conference; Extending Discovery and Briefing Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Jury Trial reset for 5/2/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (10 days, #2 on civil calendar). Previously set for 9/14/2015. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/19/2016 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Previously set for 9/1/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2016. Defenda nt's Motion to Amend Counterclaim to Seek Punitive Damages due by 1/8/2016. Defendant's Reply to 48 MOTION for Sanctions For Spoliation due by 4/20/2015. Defendant's Reply to 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Counterclaim For Breach Of Master Service Contract due by 6/1/2015. Defendant's Response to 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment due by 6/1/2015. (KT)
November 4, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 39 Motion to Suspend Scheduling Order and Resetting Deadlines. (KT)
May 14, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Amended) granting 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (amended to correct scrivener's error)(BG)
April 10, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 20 Motion to Strike. All references to punitive damages in defendant's counterclaim shall be stricken. To claim punitive damages, defendant must file a motion for leave to amend its counterclaim. (BG)
February 3, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
January 3, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2014 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 1/3/2014 (jt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross Eriksmoen, Inc. v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Eriksmoen, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Michael D. Nelson
Represented By: Michel W. Stefonowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?