Seibert et al v. Casey et al

Plaintiff: Keith E. Seibert and Julie Seibert
Defendant: Marty Casey, Yellowstone Valley Concrete & Construction, Inc. and DC, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00134
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 41 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
April 17, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal of DC Inc. d/b/a The New 4 Mile Bar With Prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
May 5, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (amended to correct e-mail address for jury instructions). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
April 7, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2014 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 9, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Carey. (BG) Distributed on 1/9/2014 (jt). Distributed to Carey on 1/9/2014. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seibert et al v. Casey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith E. Seibert
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Harris
Represented By: David S. Maring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Seibert
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Harris
Represented By: David S. Maring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone Valley Concrete & Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?