Zenergy, Inc. v. Statoil Oil & Gas LP

Plaintiff: Zenergy, Inc.
Defendant: Statoil Oil & Gas LP
Case Number: 4:2014cv00002
Filed: January 7, 2014
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2015 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 14, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The final pretrial conference set for 5/19/2015 is cancelled. It shall be rescheduled at date to be determined. Any remaining pretrial deadlines shall be held in abeyance. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 22, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 10/20/2015 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 11/3/2015 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Final Pretrial Conference and Trial were originally set for 5/19/2015 and 6/2/2015, respectively) (BG)
January 28, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zenergy, Inc. v. Statoil Oil & Gas LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenergy, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathon D. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil Oil & Gas LP
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.