World Fuel Services Corporation et al v. Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Plaintiff: World Fuel Services Corporation, World Fuel Services, Inc., World Fuel Services Canada, Inc., Western Petroleum Company, Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC, Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC, DPTS Marketing, LLC, Dakota Plains Marketing, LLC and Dakota Plains Transloading, LLC
Defendant: Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv00054
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER continuing the stay of all discovery and directing the parties to submit a status report to the court by 12/01/2015. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 32 Motion to Stay Discovery. (BG)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Rule 26 dislcosures and other discovery are stayed pending further order of the court. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/22/2016 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin Wiseman; granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anna Engh; granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Cloar. (BG)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Fuel Services Corporation et al v. Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Fuel Services Corporation
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Fuel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Fuel Services Canada, Inc.
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Petroleum Company
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DPTS Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Plains Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Plains Transloading, LLC
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alterra Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?