Sundre Sand & Gravel, Inc. v. Hensley R. Lee Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sundre Sand & Gravel, Inc.
Defendant: Hensley R. Lee Contracting, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Hensley R. Lee Contracting, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Sundre Sand & Gravel, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv00071
Filed: June 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER adopting 88 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Sundre Sand & Gravel, Inc. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: Bench Trial REset for 1/15/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (3 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Bench trial previously set for 10/09/2018)(BG)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Adopting 71 Stipulation filed by Sundre Sand & Gravel, Inc. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Bench Trial set 11/07/2017 shall be rescheduled for 4/17/2018 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (3 days). The court shall hold the 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 36 MOTION for Hearing in abeyance. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Parties are to update the court on the status of the settlement negotiations by 10/1/2017. In the interim, the court shall hold the pending motions for summary judgment in abeyance. (ZE)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: Bench Trial set for 8/29/2017 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2017 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Parties are t o update the court on the status of the settlement negotiations by 6/11/2017. In the interim, the court shall holding the pending motion for summary judgment in abeyance. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 61 replaced on 1/25/2017 to correct typographical error in document. Regenerated NEF.) (rh)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundre Sand & Gravel, Inc. v. Hensley R. Lee Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundre Sand & Gravel, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hensley R. Lee Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Nyhus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Hensley R. Lee Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Nyhus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sundre Sand & Gravel, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?