Kodiak Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. v. Burr et al
Plaintiff: Kodiak Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.
Defendant: Jolene Burr, Ted Lone Fight, Georgianna Danks, Edward S. Danks and Diana Johnson
Case Number: 4:2014cv00085
Filed: July 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 44 Motion to Dismiss; denying 52 Motion to Dismiss; granting 58 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (RLB)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Status Conference REset for 9/10/2015 at 11:00 AM CDT before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previously set for 9/10/2015 at 10:00 AM CDT) (BG)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Staying Case and Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 9/10/2015 at 10:00 AM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference reset for 5/4/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Previously set for 2/3/2015. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT) Distributed on 2/2/2015. (rh)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference reset for 2/3/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Previously set for 12/15/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Abrams. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kodiak Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. v. Burr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kodiak Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Abrams
Represented By: Patrick B. McRorie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolene Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Lone Fight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgianna Danks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Danks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?