Marchello v. C&J Energy Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cindy Marchello
Defendant: C&J Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv00018
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER LIFTING STAY: Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2017. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 10/13/2017 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 10/30/2017 at 1:30 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER STAYING CASE and cancelling the final pretrial conference and trial. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Adopting in part 26 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2016. Discovery due by 5/27/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2016. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 6/27/2016. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2016 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marchello v. C&J Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Marchello
Represented By: Stephen M. Premo
Represented By: Ross D. Stadheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&J Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Represented By: Gary R. Wolberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?