Sparks et al v. Oxy-Health, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Amy Sparks and Robert D. Sparks
Defendant: Oxy-Health, LLC and Oxy-Health Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv00649
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 120 Motion for Bill of Costs and 121 Motion for Bill of Costs - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/17/2015. (Baker, C.)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 129 Motion to Stay regarding 120 MOTION for Bill of Costs and Attorneys' Fees and 121 MOTION for Bill of Costs - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/16/2015. (Baker, C.)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JUDGMENT - Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 09/15/2015. (Baker, C.)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 97 Motion to Seal Document 85 Declaration - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/30/2015. (Baker, C.)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Seal 49 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, 48 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, 47 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, 55 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, 46 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, 53 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, 54 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit, 50 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/15/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/15/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks et al v. Oxy-Health, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Sparks
Represented By: Justin D. Bice
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Sparks
Represented By: Justin D. Bice
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxy-Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxy-Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?