Edwards v. Kennemetal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2004cv01023
Filed: May 25, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
Presiding Judge: David S. Perelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2005. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2005 Filing 56 True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Granting appellant's motion to voluntarily dismiss the 53 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 05-4005). Date issued by USCA 8/30/05 (H, S P)
August 18, 2005 Filing 55 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of 53 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 05-4005). Date filed in USCA 8/12/05. (H, S P)
July 25, 2005 Filing 54 Order that the plaintiff's letter of July 18, 2005 re 53 notice of appeal filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. be docketed as a timely notice of appeal as of July 22, 2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 7/25/05. (W, Jo)
July 22, 2005 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 6th Circuit Court of Appeals from the 51 Order of 6/21/05 and 52 Judgment of 6/22/05, filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. Filing Fee Not Paid (W, Jo). Modified text on 7/26/2005 (H, S P).
June 22, 2005 Filing 52 Judgment Order (Case Dismissal) - Upon consideration of the parties' submissions on the merits, it is hereby ordered that final judgment is entered in defendant's favor; see this Court's Memorandum Opinion of even date. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 06/21/05. (G, S)
June 21, 2005 Filing 51 Order denying Motion to strike (Related Doc # 42 ), moot Motion for order (Related Doc # 43 ), moot Motion to strike (Related Doc # 43 ), granting Motion for order (Related Doc # 45 ), denying Motion to strike (Related Doc # 46 ), granting Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc # 32 ), moot Motion to dismiss (Related Doc # 40 ). This Court finds that there are no genuine issues of material fact on the claims raised by plaintiff and that defendant is entitled to judgment as a matter of law. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 06/21/05.(G, S) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2005 (G, S).
June 6, 2005 Filing 50 Brief of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Affidavits of Defendants in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Sernik, Craig)
May 24, 2005 Filing 49 Affidavit of James M. Lemieux filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. (C, K A)
May 24, 2005 Filing 48 Affidavit of William Middleton filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. (C, K A)
May 24, 2005 Filing 47 Affidavit of Kimberly Wilms filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. (C, K A)
May 24, 2005 Filing 46 Motion to strike defendant's affidavits filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. (C, K A)
May 24, 2005 Filing 45 Motion to file manually filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. (C, K A)
May 11, 2005 Filing 44 Reply to response to Motion for summary judgment filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. Related document(s) 32 . (Sernik, Craig)
May 10, 2005 Filing 43 Objections to and Motion to strike Documents Provided by the Plaintiff in its Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 6/15/2005 (B, B). (E-mail sent to attorney on 6/15/2005 re: more appropriate choice of event)
May 6, 2005 Filing 42 Motion to strike Plaintiff's Memoranda in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 5/12/2005 (B, B).
April 28, 2005 Filing 41 Opposition to Motion for summary judgment filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. Related document(s) 32 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Exhibit E# 4 Exhibit F# 5 Exhibit G)(C, K A)
April 28, 2005 Filing 40 Motion to dismiss and elect to seek remedy for the cause of action filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. (C, K A)
March 9, 2005 Filing 39 Order - The discovery cut-off date is extended to 3/17/05, plaintiff's date to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment is extended to 4/15/05 with defendant's reply to be filed 4/29/05. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 03/09/05. (G, S)
March 9, 2005 Filing 38 Minutes of proceedings. Discovery conference held on 03/09/05 before Magistrate Judge Perelman. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman, (G, S) Modified text of docket entry on 3/15/2005 (B, B).
February 23, 2005 Filing 37 Minutes of proceedings. Interim Pretrial Conference held on 02/23/05 before Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman. Unable to reach plaintiff's counsel, phone temporarily disconnected. Plaintiff's motion to extend will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman, (G, S) Modified text of docket entry on 2/25/2005 (B, B).
February 23, 2005 Filing 36 Order granting 35 Cornell G. Edwards, Sr.'s Motion to Extend Deadlines; and the plaintiff is granted until March 11, 2005 to conclude all discovery and shall respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment by March 25, 2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 02/23/05.(G, S) Modified text of docket entry on 2/25/2005 (B, B).
February 22, 2005 Filing 35 Motion for extension of discovery until 1/31/05 filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(C, K A)
February 10, 2005 Filing 34 Appendix to memorandum of law in support of motion for summary judgment filed by Kennemetal, Inc. Related document 32 . Complete document on file in Clerk's Office.(C, K A)
February 10, 2005 Filing 33 Deposition of Cornell G. Edwards, Sr., taken on 11/15/04 filed by Kennemetal, Inc. Related document 31 . Complete document on file in Clerk's Office.(C, K A)
February 9, 2005 Filing 32 Motion for summary judgment filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support # 2 Notice of Manual Filing)(Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 2/15/2005 (B, B).
February 9, 2005 Filing 31 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Cornell G. Edwards filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 2/15/2005 (B, B).
January 24, 2005 Filing 30 Judgment entry signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 1/24/05. Upon motion (Related Doc # 29 ) of the defendant and for good cause shown, the page limitation as contained in Local Rule 7.1(f), is waived for Defendant's Memorandum in support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is ORDERED that Defendant may proceed with the filing of its Motion for Summary Judgment along with its accompanying Memorandum of Law, with said Memorandum not to exceed forty (40) double spaced pages, with one inch side margins, excluding the table of contents, table of authorities cited, brief statement of the issues to be decided, and a summary of the argument presented.(W, Jo) Modified text of docket entry on 1/26/2005 (B, B).
January 24, 2005 Filing 29 Motion for Enlargement of Page Limitation of Memorandum filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Judgment Entry)(Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 1/26/2005 (B, B).
January 20, 2005 Filing 28 Notice of Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2005 at 02:30 PM in Chambers 11A before Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman. Counsel only to attend. (G, S) Modified text of docket entry on 1/25/2005 (B, B).
January 7, 2005 Filing 27 Notice of Service (submission) of discovery on 1/5/05 filed by Cornell G. Edwards, Sr. (C, K A)
January 5, 2005 Filing 26 Order: It is ordered that the motion to compel is granted and full responses to defendant's discovery shall be made no later that January 14, 2005, (with failure to do so providing a basis for dismissal with prejudice) (Related Doc # 25 ), and It is also ordered that the motion to deem as admitted the request for admissions propounded to the plaintiff on October 26, 2004 is granted(Related Doc # 25 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 1/5/05 (W, Jo). Modified on 1/12/2005 (W, Jo). Modified text on 7/26/2005 (H, S P).
December 15, 2004 Filing 25 Motion for Order to Deem Defendant's Requests for Admission Admitted, Motion to compel discovery filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4)(Sernik, Craig)
December 14, 2004 Filing 24 Notice of Submission of objections and answers to plaintiff's interrogatories on 12/14/2004 filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 1/3/2005 (B, B).
December 14, 2004 Filing 23 Notice of submission of First Supplemental Initial Discovery Disclosures on 12/14/2004 filed by defendant. (Sernik, Craig) Modified on 1/3/2005 (B, B). (E-mail sent to attorney on 1/3/2005 re: more appropriate choice of event)
November 12, 2004 Filing 22 Order granting the joint motion to continue pretrial and motion for extension of discovery deadline (Related Doc # 21 )Discovery due by 1/31/2005. Pretrial to be set in February 2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 11/12/04.(G, S) Modified text of docket entry on 11/30/2004 (B, B).
November 11, 2004 Filing 21 Joint Motion to continue pretrial and motion for extension of discovery deadline until 1/31/2005 filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 11/19/2004 (B, B). (E-mail sent to attorney on 11/19/2004 re: 2 part motions)
November 4, 2004 Filing 20 Notice to take Deposition of Plaintiff on November 11, 2004 filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Sernik, Craig)
November 1, 2004 Filing 19 Notice of Pretrial set for Thursday, November 18, 2004 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Perelman in Chambers 11A. Counsel only to attend. (G, S) Modified text of docket entry on 11/2/2004 (B, B).
November 1, 2004 Filing 18 Required Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. Civ. R. Pro. 26 (a) (1) and (2) filed by Cornell G. Edwards Sr (S, DJ). Modified text of docket entry on 11/2/2004 (B, B).
October 26, 2004 Filing 17 Notice of Service of Defendant's Written Discovery Served Upon Plaintiff filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Muller, Carl)
September 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Upon consideration of defendant's "Motion To Compel The provision of the initial disclosures required pursuant to Fed. Civ. R. Pro. 236(a)(1) and (2), And motion for sanctions" (Doc. 14), seeking an order requiring the plaintiff to submit his initial disclosures and for an award of sanctions in the sum of $525.00, the said motion having been filed September 2, 2004 and remaining unopposed which this Court views as a tacit acquiescence therein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff submit his initial disclosures no later than October 4, 2004 and, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that sanction are imposed against plaintiff and his counsel in the sum of $525.00, to be paid to defendant's counsel no later than October 11, 2004. (Related Doc # 14 ). Signed by Judge David S. Perelman on 9/27/04.(W, Jo) Modified text of docket entry on 9/28/2004 (B, B).
September 7, 2004 Filing 15 Affidavit of Craig F. Sernik in support of motion to compel and for sanctions filed by Kennemetal, Inc. Related document(s) 14 . (C, K A)
September 2, 2004 Filing 14 Motion to compel the provision of the initial disclosures required pursuant to Fed. Civ. R. Pro. 26 (a) (1) (2) and motion for sanctions filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 9/3/2004 (B, B). (E-mail sent to attorney on 9/3/2004 re: 2 part motions)
August 11, 2004 Filing 13 Notice of the Provision of Required Disclosures pursuant to Fed. Civ. R. Pro. 26 (a) (1) and (2) filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Sernik, Craig) Modified text of docket entry on 8/12/2004 (B, B).
July 13, 2004 Filing 12 Minutes of proceedings. Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/13/04 before Judge David S. Perelman. Case assigned to standard track, plaintiff granted to 7/30 to move to amend complaint; discovery to close by 11/19, recall late October - early November. (C, E)
June 28, 2004 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (Muller, Carl)
June 22, 2004 Filing 10 Notice of Pretrial - A pretrial is set for Tuesday, July 13, 2004 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge David Perelman. Counsel only to attend. Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman, (G, S)
June 21, 2004 Filing 9 Order cancelling 6/30/04 case managment conference. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/21/04. (P, R)
June 21, 2004 Filing 8 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/21/04. (P, R)
June 17, 2004 Filing 7 Marginal Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to continue (Related Doc # 6 ).Case management conference reset for 6/30/2004 at 9:00 AM at Chambers 18B. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/17/04.(P, R)
June 10, 2004 Filing 6 Motion to continue case management conference filed by Cornell G. Edwards Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(C, K A)
June 4, 2004 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order.Case management conference to be held on 6/24/2004 at 9:00 AM at Chambers 18B. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/4/04. (P, R)
June 1, 2004 Filing 4 Original copies of pleadings from the Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas, Case number 2004 CV 370. (R, N)
May 25, 2004 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc # 1 ) filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. (W, Jo)
May 25, 2004 Filing 2 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Perelman (W, Jo)
May 25, 2004 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Ashtabula County Common Pleas Court. Filed by Kennemetal, Inc.. Filing fee paid; receipt number 661058. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(W, Jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Kennemetal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?