Talamo v. Lincoln Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Salvador D. Talamo
Defendant: Deloro Stellite Company, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Industrial Welding Supplies of Hattiesburg, Inc., A.O. Smith Corporation, Eutectic Corporation, John Doe, Hobart Brothers Company, General Electric Company, Miller Electric Manufacturing Co., Inc., Select Arc, Inc., Sandvik, Inc., ESAB Group, Inc., Viacom, Inc., Praxair, Inc., Lincoln Electric Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Airgas-Gulf States, Inc., Allegheny Technologies Incorporated, BOC Group, Inc. and Illinois Tool Works, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007wf17001
Filed: January 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M O'Malley (MDL1535)
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2008 Termination of case. (Related Doc. #'s #8 , #9 ). (S,R)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice. (Related Doc #8 ). Signed by Judge Kathleen M. O'Malley on 1/17/08.(S,R)
December 27, 2007 Filing 8 Motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice and notice of election to participate in tolling agreement filed by Plaintiff Salvador D. Talamo. (Bruno, Sr., Joseph) Modified on 1/9/2008 (S,R).
July 6, 2007 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc # []) filed by Miller Electric Manufacturing Co., Inc.. (Brothers, Alan)
July 6, 2007 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc # []) filed by Illinois Tool Works, Inc.. (Brothers, Alan)
April 3, 2007 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Industrial Welding Supplies of Hattiesburg, Inc. (Powell, Kris) Modified on 4/4/2007 (S, R).
February 27, 2007 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Airgas-Gulf States, Inc. (Sarver, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2007 (S, R).
February 27, 2007 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Hobart Brothers Company, ESAB Group, Inc., Praxair, Inc., Viacom, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Eutectic Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, Sandvik, Inc., BOC Group, Inc., Allegheny Technologies Incorporated, Lincoln Electric Company. (Sarver, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2007 (S, R).
February 5, 2007 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Deloro Stellite Company, Inc. (Bukovac, Daniel) Modified on 2/6/2007 (S, R).
January 24, 2007 Filing 1 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-46) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case from Eastern District of Lousiana to the Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Notice of removal#2 petition#3 docket sheet)(S,J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talamo v. Lincoln Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloro Stellite Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Bukovac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Michael M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Welding Supplies of Hattiesburg, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Smith
Represented By: Kris A. Powell
Represented By: Michael J. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eutectic Corporation
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brothers Company
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Electric Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Alan W. Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Arc, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Sistrunk
Represented By: Kyle P. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandvik, Inc.
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESAB Group, Inc.
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair, Inc.
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Company
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas-Gulf States, Inc.
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegheny Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOC Group, Inc.
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Represented By: Mark J. Fernandez
Represented By: Richard E. Sarver
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Tool Works, Inc.
Represented By: Alan W. Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador D. Talamo
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?