Castillow Sr. v. Airgas-Gulf States, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zollie B. Castillow, Sr.
Defendant: Deloro Stellite Company, Inc., Columbia Welding Service, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Eiland's Welders Supply, Inc., Linde Gases Of The South, Inc., Arcos Industries, LLC, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., TDY Industries, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, BOC Financial Corporation, Hobart Brothers Company, General Electric Company, Lincoln Electric Company, John Doe, BOC Group, Inc., Industrial Welding Supplies of Hattiesburg, Inc., Magnolia Welding Supply Co., Inc., Union Carbide Chemical and Plastics Co., Inc., Lincoln Electric Holdings, ESAB Group, Inc., Viacom, Inc., Gulf Coast Marine Supply Company, Dow Chemical Corporation, Airgas-Gulf States, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Gulf TC Corporation, Capweld, Inc., Welding Engineering Supply Company, Inc., Eutectic Corporation, Select Arc, Inc., Sandvik, Inc., Miller Electric Manufacturing Company, Inc., Praxair, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, B&R Industrial Supply and Socra Corporation
Case Number: 1:2007wf17015
Filed: February 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M O'Malley (MDL1535)
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2010 Filing 6 Marginal Order granting Defendants' Motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Judge Kathleen M. O'Malley on 6/21/10. (S,R)
December 30, 2009 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for lack of prosecution filed by Defendant Welding Engineering Supply Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Campbell, Barry)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Richard F. Scruggs; John W. (aka Don) Barrett and Scott O. Nelson removed from case. (Related Doc #3 ). Judge Kathleen M. O'Malley (MDL1535) on 10/8/2009.(S,J)
September 8, 2009 Filing 3 Motion by John W. Barrett, Richard F. Scruggs and Scott O. Nelson to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Zollie B. Castillow, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Scott)
February 23, 2007 This is one of the 31 cases inadvertently not opened in 2004, when Southern District of Mississippi case no. 2:04-172 was transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and severed. If any amendments need to be made to this record pursuant subsequent orders filed by this court, parties will need to enter a stipulation with the appropriate changes to be made. (S,R)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order. This Order applies to "Welding Rod" cases filed in other courts and then transferred to this Court. Court Orders that the complaint of each individual plaintiff in each of the "multi-plaintiff" cases shall be SEVERED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. O'Malley on 11/20/2003. (Attachments: # 1) (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR NEW CASE NUMBERS). (Attachments: #1 List of Severed Case Numbers) (S,R)
February 23, 2007 Filing 1 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-12) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case from the Southern District of Mississippi to the Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 SDMS Docket Sheet #2 First Amended Complaint #3 Exhibit A Plaintiff List)(S,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillow Sr. v. Airgas-Gulf States, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloro Stellite Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Edmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Welding Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Wallace
Represented By: David A. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eiland's Welders Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Rutledge
Represented By: Gregg L. Spyridon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linde Gases Of The South, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcos Industries, LLC
Represented By: Leah Louise Broussard
Represented By: Steven Jay Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Tool Works, Inc.
Represented By: O. Stephen Montagnet, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Forman
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOC Financial Corporation
Represented By: Randi Peresich Mueller
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brothers Company
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John C. McCants, III
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Company
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOC Group, Inc.
Represented By: Randi Peresich Mueller
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Welding Supplies of Hattiesburg, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Welding Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Represented By: Robert R. Cirilli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Chemical and Plastics Co., Inc.
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Holdings
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESAB Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Marine Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence E. Abbott
Represented By: Nancy A. Brechtel
Represented By: Ross F. Lagarde
Represented By: Charles Henderson Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas-Gulf States, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Louis McBride, Jr.
Represented By: Robert R. Cirilli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Clay W. Morgan
Represented By: W. Wayne Drinkwater, Jr.
Represented By: Roy D. Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf TC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capweld, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welding Engineering Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Terence L. High
Represented By: Barry C. Campbell
Represented By: Michael S. Minyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eutectic Corporation
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Arc, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn M. Cappel
Represented By: Richard M. Edmonson
Represented By: Jennifer A. Riester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandvik, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Electric Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: O. Stephen Montagnet, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praxair, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Mark C Carroll
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Lewis W. Bell
Represented By: Walker W. Jones, III
Represented By: Suzanne M. Collipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&R Industrial Supply
Represented By: Jack R. Dodson, III
Represented By: C. York Craig, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socra Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zollie B. Castillow, Sr.
Represented By: Richard F. Scruggs
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Scott O. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?