Glazer v. Chase Home Finance LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence R. Glazer
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC, Cindy A. Smith, Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co., Ronald Chernek, Darryl Gormley, Safeguard Properties, Inc. and Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2009cv01262
Filed: June 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Opinion and Order: The Court grants, in part, summary judgment for Defendants (ECF # 295 ) on Counts I, III and IV of Glazer's Fourth Amended Complaint (FAC). The Court finds genuine issues of fact require denying Glazer's (EC F # 293 ) and Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Count II of Glazer's FAC insofar as it pertains to representations made by Defendants' that Chase Home Finance LLC was the owner of the Note and Mortgage. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/25/2019. (D, I)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Opinion and Order. Defendants Reimer Law Co., Ronald Chernek and Darryl Gormley's Motion to Strike and Dismiss Class Allegations and Claims Contained in Third Amended Complaint (Related doc # 280 ) is granted. This case shall proceed o n Plaintiff's individual claims. Parties shall confer and submit to the Court, by 2/28/2019, a new proposed schedule to include a settlement conference and trial date to be held before the end of 2019. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/15/2019. (H,CM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint and to Reinstate Plaintiff's Counsel of Record (Related doc # 272 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff shall file Amended Complaint that complies fully wi th this Order by 4/4/2018. The parties shall confer and submit proposed schedule for dispositive motions, class certification briefing and a class certification hearing by 4/11/2018. If the parties cannot agree, they shall submit unilateral dates. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/28/2018. (H,CM)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Order. Defendants' Renewed Motion to Strike Class Allegations (Related doc # 255 ) is granted in part. The Court strikes Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification (Related doc # 253 ) subject to reinstatement if leave i s granted. Plaintiff is ordered to file Motion for Leave to Amend within seven days from the date of this Order. Defendants shall file an opposition within seven days after filing of the Motion for Leave. If the Court grants leave to Amend, it will order the Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Opposition and Reply be reinstated on the docket and will expedite its ruling. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/31/2017.(H,CM)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Related doc # 86 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/25/2014. (H,CM)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Opinion and Order Adopting Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. The Court dismisses with prejudice Plaintiff's claims under the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act (FDCPA) and declines to exercise its supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims, dismissing them without prejudice. Related 53 Report and Recommendation 24 23 25 19 18 . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 03/31/10. (M,M)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Report and Recommendation that defendants' motions to dismiss (Doc. Nos. 18 , 23 , and 25 ) be granted. Specifically, it is recommended that all of plaintiff's federal FDCPA claims be dismissed with prejudice and that his remaining state claims be dismissed without prejudice. It is further recommended that plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint (Doc. No. 30 ) be denied as futile. Signed by Magistrate Judge Greg White on 1/21/2010. (S,S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glazer v. Chase Home Finance LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence R. Glazer
Represented By: Nicolette Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reimer, Arnovitz, Chernek & Jeffrey Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Chernek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?