Garver v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michelle Garver
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02921
Filed: December 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Filing 17 Stipulated Order of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs, Interests or Attorneys' Fees to Any Party, re #16 Proposed Order filed by Michelle Garver. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/30/10. (M,M)
November 26, 2010 Filing 16 Proposed Order of Dismissal (Stipulated) filed by Michelle Garver. Related document(s) #15 . (Bernard, Dale)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order of Case Dismissal. It is ordered this action is closed. It shall be marked settled and dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to (1) vacate this Order and reopen the action upon cause shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary or (2) alter the terms of settlement and dismissal upon agreement of the parties. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/10/10. (M,M)
October 1, 2010 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Greg White. (K,K)
September 14, 2010 Minutes of proceedings [non document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko.Telephone Status Conference held on 09/14/10. Court grants extension of non-expert discovery for thirty days only to 11/15/10. Settlement Conference reset to 11/15/2010 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 15B before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. (Counsel will call into Court and confirm client's availability). Parties are admonished to comply with Court's Standing Settlement Conference Order.(Court Reporter: None.)Time: 10 minutes. (M,M)
September 13, 2010 Filing 14 Protective Order. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 09/13/10. (M,M)
September 10, 2010 Filing 13 Proposed Order - Stipulated Protective Order filed by All Parties. (Gross, Joseph)
September 9, 2010 Filing 12 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Answers, Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents filed by Michelle Garver. (Bernard, Dale)
July 10, 2010 Filing 11 Notice of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents filed by Michelle Garver. (Bernard, Dale)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Robert J. Muchnick for Quicken Loans, Inc. (Related Doc #10 )on condition attorney appear in person for all conferences and register for Electronic Case Filing. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/30/2010.(R,D)
June 28, 2010 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Robert J. Muchnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4160779, filed by Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Gross, Joseph)
June 16, 2010 Minutes of proceedings [non document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko.Case Management Conference held on 06/15/10. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 10/15/2010. Settlement Conference set for 10/14/2010 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 15B before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Lead counsel and all parties with full settlement authority shall be present. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/14/2010 at 02:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Plaintiff to initiate. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 20 minutes. (M,M)
June 10, 2010 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Parties. (Gross, Joseph)
May 14, 2010 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 6/15/2010 at 02:00 PM at Chambers 15B before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 05/14/10. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(M,M)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney William D. Sargent for Quicken Loans, Inc. on condition counsel appears for all proceedings and registers for Electronic Case Filing (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 05/14/10.(M,M)
May 13, 2010 Filing 7 Motion for attorney William D. Sargent to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4094455, filed by Defendant Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Gross, Joseph)
April 30, 2010 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Gross, Joseph)
April 30, 2010 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Gross, Joseph)
March 22, 2010 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Michelle Garver. Quicken Loans, Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2010, answer due 5/14/2010. filed on behalf of Michelle Garver (Bernard, Dale)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order. Because there is nothing in the record to show why the Plaintiff was unable to obtain service upon the Defendant within 120 days, the Court notifies the Plaintiff that unless good cause is shown for failure to serve said Defendant as provided under the Rules, this Defendant will be dismissed without prejudice on April 19, 2010. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/18/2010. (R,D)
December 17, 2009 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (C,BA)
December 17, 2009 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Gallas. (C,BA)
December 17, 2009 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (C,BA)
December 16, 2009 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Quicken Loans, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 350, receipt number 0647-3879597. Filed by Michelle Garver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A"-EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit "B"--EEOC Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bernard, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garver v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Muchnick
Represented By: William D. Sargent
Represented By: Joseph N. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Garver
Represented By: Dale A. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?