In Re Invacare Derivative Litigation
Plaintiff: Colleen Witmer
Defendant: Dan T. Moore, III, C. Martin Harris, Dale C. LaPorte, James L. Jones, Joseph B. Richey, II, Gerald B. Blouch, A. Malachi Mixon, Charles S. Robb, James C. Boland, Michael F. Delaney, Invacare Corporation and William M. Weber
Case Number: 1:2012cv00259
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order and final judgment granting lead counsel's fee and expense application in its entirety and awards $1,300,000 to Lead Counsel for attorneys; fees and expenses, and finds that such award is fair and reasonable. Payment shall be made on behalf of Invacare in accordance with the terms of the Stipulation and subject to any refund or repayment obligations of Plaintiffs' Counsel in accordance with the terms of the Stipulation. The Court approves the Special Awards in the amount of $10,000 in total to Plaintiffs based on the substantial benefits created through Plaintiffs' participation in the Consolidated Action. The Special Awards shall be paid out of the attorneys' fees and expenses awarded to Plaintiffs' Counsel and allocated to Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs' Counsel in accordance w/the terms of the stipulation. Judge Dan A. Polster(C,KA)
March 21, 2012 Notice [non-document]: 4/16/12 Telephone Conference rescheduled for 4/17/2012 at 3:00 PM on the Courts' bridge line. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01893-DAP, 1:12-cv-00259-DAP (P,R)
March 21, 2012 Notice to Attorneys Brian J. Robbins, Felipe J. Arroyo, Shane P. Sanders and Kevin S. Kim. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. Related document(s)(17 in 1:11-cv-01893-DAP), (11 in 1:12-cv-00259-DAP). Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00259-DAP, 1:11-cv-01893-DAP (G,CA)
March 21, 2012 Filing 13 Stipulated Protective Order. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/21/12. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01893-DAP, 1:12-cv-00259-DAP(P,R)
March 20, 2012 Filing 12 Joint Motion for protective order filed by Gerald B. Blouch, Michael F. Delaney, C. Martin Harris, Invacare Corporation, James L. Jones, Jr, Dale C. LaPorte, Aaron Malachi Mixon, III, Dan T. Moore, III, Joseph B. Richey, II, Charles C. Robb, William M. Weber, Gerald B. Blouch, James C. Boland, Michael F. Delaney, C. Martin Harris, Invacare Corporation, James L. Jones, Dale C. LaPorte, A. Malachi Mixon, Dan T. Moore, III, Joseph B. Richey, II, Charles S. Robb, William M. Weber, City of Lansing Police and Fire Retirement System, Colleen Witmer. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Agreement and Order, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Agreement and Order)Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01893-DAP, 1:12-cv-00259-DAP(Berckmueller, Fritz)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order consolidating case w/11cv1893. Judge Dan A. Polster(C,KA)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting #9 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time until 4/30/12 to Answer. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/16/12.(P,R)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Atty Gregory Del Gaizo for Plaintiff. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #3 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/16/12.(P,R)
March 12, 2012 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. Judge Donald C. Nugent terminated. (C,BA)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Dan Polster as a related case for all further proceedings. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/12/12. (R,JM)
March 9, 2012 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 30, 2012 to answer filed by Gerald B. Blouch, James C. Boland, Michael F. Delaney, C. Martin Harris, Invacare Corporation, James L. Jones, Dale C. LaPorte, A. Malachi Mixon, Dan T. Moore, III, Joseph B. Richey, II, Charles S. Robb, William M. Weber. (Blair, Mitchell)
March 5, 2012 Filing 8 Joint Motion to reassign case to Judge Dan Polster filed by Gerald B. Blouch, James C. Boland, Michael F. Delaney, C. Martin Harris, Invacare Corporation, James L. Jones, Dale C. LaPorte, A. Malachi Mixon, Dan T. Moore, III, Joseph B. Richey, II, Charles S. Robb, William M. Weber, Plaintiff Colleen Witmer. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Transfer the Related Case, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Transfer the Related Case)(Blair, Mitchell)
February 29, 2012 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon William M. Weber on 2/16/2012, filed on behalf of Colleen Witmer (Karon, Daniel)
February 29, 2012 Filing 6 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Joseph B. Richey, II on 2/18/2012, filed on behalf of Colleen Witmer (Karon, Daniel)
February 29, 2012 Filing 5 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon James C. Boland, no date of service indicated on green card, filed on behalf of Colleen Witmer (Karon, Daniel)
February 29, 2012 Filing 4 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Invacare Corporation on 2/17/2012, filed on behalf of Colleen Witmer (Karon, Daniel)
February 9, 2012 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Gregory E. Del Gaizo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-5175055, filed by Plaintiff Colleen Witmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Karon, Daniel)
February 6, 2012 Notice to Attorney Richard A. Maniskas. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,G)
February 3, 2012 Notice to Attorney Gregory Del Gaizo. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,G)
February 3, 2012 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Gerald B. Blouch, James C. Boland, Michael F. Delaney, C. Martin Harris, Invacare Corporation (2 addresses), James L. Jones, Dale C. LaPorte, A. Malachi Mixon, Dan T. Moore, III, Joseph B. Richey, II, Charles S. Robb, William M. Weber. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (C,B)
February 2, 2012 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Baughman. (C,B)
February 2, 2012 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (C,B)
February 2, 2012 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 350, Receipt number 0647-5161168. Filed by Colleen Witmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Karon, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Invacare Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan T. Moore, III
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Martin Harris
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale C. LaPorte
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Jones
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph B. Richey, II
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Fritz E. Berckmueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald B. Blouch
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Fritz E. Berckmueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Malachi Mixon
Represented By: Mitchell G. Blair
Represented By: Fritz E. Berckmueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Robb
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Boland
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Delaney
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invacare Corporation
Represented By: Ernest P. Mansour
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Embleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Weber
Represented By: James A. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Witmer
Represented By: Shane P. Sanders
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Gregory Del Gaizo
Represented By: Daniel R. Karon
Represented By: Richard A. Maniskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?