Harrison v. Progressive Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Delbert Harrison
Defendant: Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Unknown Companies 1-99, Progressive Direct Insurance Co., Progressive Corporation, Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. and Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00625
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/8/13. (LC,S) re #47
January 8, 2013 Filing 47 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Delbert Harrison, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Johnston, Michael)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion to Seal and for good cause shown, the Motion is hereby GRANTED. The clerk is hereby ORDERED to seal the First Amended Class and Collective Action Complaint and the attachments (Exhibits A and B) thereto (Dkt. No. 27) and Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Strike (Dkt. No. 33), which were previously filed in the captioned action. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/7/13. (LC,S) re #45
January 2, 2013 Filing 45 Joint Motion to seal document #27 Amended complaint, #33 Opposition filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co., Plaintiff Delbert Harrison. Related document(s) #27 , #33 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnston, Michael)
October 22, 2012 Filing 44 Answer to #27 Amended complaint filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 Filing 43 Case Management Order: Case Management Conference was held on 10/12/12. Case is assigned to the complex track. Case is not suitable for ADR at this time by may be after discovery. Non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before 3/12/13. Expert reports shall be exchanged on or before 3/12/13 for party with burden of proof & 4/12/13 for Rebuttal and Expert Discovery shall be completed on or before 5/12/13. Pleadings shall be amended without leave of Court and new parties shall be joined on or before N/A. Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 6/12/13. Status Conference is set for 1/31/13 at 9:00 AM. Parties must be available by telephone. Counsel must appear in person unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Counsel shall confer in person or by phone within seventy-two (72) hours of any scheduled conference to discuss outstanding issues and respective positions as to settlement. Counsel shall provide to the Court no later than forty-eight (48) hours of the conference, a brief written Status Report describing the status of discovery, settlement positions, and issues to be addressed. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/12/12. (LC,S) Time: 30 mins.
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Through and Including October 22, 2012 to Answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is Granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/9/12. (LC,S) re #42
October 8, 2012 Filing 42 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 22, 2012 to answer First Amended Complaint filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
September 25, 2012 Filing 41 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, or, alternatively, to Strike the Class and Collective Action Allegations (Doc. #31 ). The Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's class and collective action claims and plaintiff's claims alleging "disparate impact." The Court otherwise denies defendants' motion. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 9/25/12. (LC,S)
August 30, 2012 Filing 40 Appendix to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, or, Alternatively, to Strike the Class and Collective Action Allegations filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. Related document(s) #39 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Armstrong v. Whirlpool Corp, #2 Exhibit C - Barghout v. Bayer Healthcare Pharm., #3 Exhibit D - Bluford v. Swift Transportation, #4 Exhibit E - Bolden v. Walsh Construction Co., #5 Exhibit F - Brown v. Worthington Steel, #6 Exhibit G - Dallas v. Alcatel-Lucent USA, #7 Exhibit H - Dean v. The Boeing Co., #8 Exhibit I - EEOC v. GMRI, #9 Exhibit J - EEOC v. Texas Roadhouse, #10 Exhibit K - Eliason v. General Building Products, #11 Exhibit L - Faktor v. Lifestyle Lift, #12 Exhibit M - Floyd v. City of New York, #13 Exhibit N - Gascho v. Global Fitness Holdings, #14 Exhibit O - Hagler v. True Manufacturing Co., #15 Exhibit P - Harding v. Time Warner, #16 Exhibit Q - Hodczak v. Latrobe Speciality Co., #17 Exhibit R - Keys v. Humana, #18 Exhibit S - Kissling v. Ohio Casualty Insurance Co., #19 Exhibit T - McKnight v. Gates, #20 Exhibit U - McReynolds v. Merrill Lynch, #21 Exhibit V - Nicholas v. CMRE Financial Services, #22 Exhibit W - O'Neal v. Wackenhut Services Inc., #23 Exhibit X - Parrish v. Ford Motor Co., #24 Exhibit Y - Phillips v. Cohen, #25 Exhibit Z - Pickering v. Lorillard Tobacco Co., #26 Exhibit AA - Powell v. Tosh, #27 Exhibit BB - Reeb v. Ohio Dep't of Rehab and Corrections, #28 Exhibit CC - Rikos v. The Proctor & Gamble Co., #29 Exhibit DD - Rivera v. Lebanon School Dist., #30 Exhibit EE - Savett v. Whirlpool Corp., #31 Exhibit FF - Scott v. Family Dollar Store, #32 Exhibit GG - Serrano v. Cintas Corp., #33 Exhibit HH- Sewell v. Bovis Lend Lease, #34 Exhibit II - Snir v. Ams. Collectibles Network, #35 Exhibit JJ - St. Croix v. Genetec)(Johnston, Michael)
August 30, 2012 Filing 39 Reply to response to #31 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint, or, Alternatively Motion to strike the Class and Collective Action Allegations filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Position Statement)(Johnston, Michael)
August 14, 2012 Filing 38 Appendix to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Strike-Unreported Cases-Part IV filed by Delbert Harrison. Related document(s) #33 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US v. City of NY-Part 1, #2 Exhibit 2-US v. City of NY-Part 2, #3 Exhibit 3-US v. City of NY-Part 3, #4 Exhibit 4-Vereen-Lou Sobh, #5 Exhibit 5-Warren v. Xerox-Part 1, #6 Exhibit 6-Warren v. Xerox- Part 2, #7 Exhibit 7-Williams v. Wells Fargo, #8 Exhibit 8-Wright v. Stern)(Griffin, Mark)
August 14, 2012 Filing 37 Appendix to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Strike-Unreported Cases-Part 3 filed by Delbert Harrison. Related document(s) #33 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Leonard v. Southec, #2 Exhibit 2-Abdallah v. Coca-Cola, #3 Exhibit 3-Neal v. Moore-Part 1, #4 Exhibit 4-Neal v. Moore-Part 2, #5 Exhibit 5-Oginski v. Paragon, #6 Exhibit 6-Palmer v. Combined Ins, #7 Exhibit 7-Rivera v. Lebanon School District, #8 Exhibit 8-Romano v. Motorola., #9 Exhibit 9-Savett v. Whirlpool, #10 Exhibit 10-Sellers v. Boehringer, #11 Exhibit 11-Sewell v. Bovis, #12 Exhibit 12-Shores v. Publix, #13 Exhibit 13-Sjoblom v. Charter)(Griffin, Mark)
August 14, 2012 Filing 36 Appendix to Plaintiff's Memoradum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Strike-Unreported Cases-Part II filed by Delbert Harrison. Related document(s) #33 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Donovan v. Philips-Part 1, #2 Exhibit 2-Donovan v. Philips-Part 2, #3 Exhibit 3-Edwards v. Woodforest, #4 Exhibit 4-Eliason v. Gentek, #5 Exhibit 5-Faktor v. Lifestyle, #6 Exhibit 6-Floyd v. City of NY-Part 1, #7 Exhibit 7-Floyd v. City of NY-Part 2, #8 Exhibit 8-Francis v. Mead Johnson, #9 Exhibit 9-Greenleaf v. DTG Operations, #10 Exhibit 10-Ingram v. Madisen Square Garden, #11 Exhibit 11-Janes v. Triborough Bridge, #12 Exhibit 12-Jefferson v. Windy City., #13 Exhibit 13-Johnson v. Flakeboard, #14 Exhibit 14-Kelly v. Montgomery, #15 Exhibit 15-Keys v. Humana)(Griffin, Mark)
August 14, 2012 Filing 35 Appendix to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Strike-Unreported Cases-Part 1 filed by Delbert Harrison. Related document(s) #33 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Abizo v. Wachovia-Part 1, #2 Exhibit 2-Abizo v. Wachovia-Part 2, #3 Exhibit 3-Alvarado v. Carnation, #4 Exhibit 4-Barghout v. Bayer, #5 Exhibit 5-Battle v. White, #6 Exhibit 6-Black v. Franklin, #7 Exhibit 7-Brown v. Yellow, #8 Exhibit 8-Chenensky v. NYL, #9 Exhibit 9-Dean v. Boeing-Part 1, #10 Exhibit 10-Dean v. Boeing-Part 2)(Griffin, Mark)
August 13, 2012 Filing 34 Appendix to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Strike filed by Delbert Harrison. Related document(s) #33 . (Griffin, Mark)
August 13, 2012 Filing 33 Opposition to #31 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint, or, Alternatively Motion to strike filed by Delbert Harrison. (Griffin, Mark) Modified on 1/8/2013 (LC,S). (SEALED PER ORDER OF 01/07/13)
July 6, 2012 Filing 32 Appendix (Case Law) filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. Related document(s) #31 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Allen v. Sears, #2 Exhibit D - Bizzell v. Target, #3 Exhibit E - Blandford v. Exxon, #4 Exhibit F - Bluford v. Swift, #5 Exhibit G - Creely v. HCR, #6 Exhibit H - Dorn v. GM, #7 Exhibit I - Grant v. Metro Gov., #8 Exhibit J - Hagler v. True Mfg., #9 Exhibit K - In re Countrywide, #10 Exhibit L - In re Ford Motor Co., #11 Exhibit M - Johnson v. State of Conn., #12 Exhibit N - Keys v. Humana, #13 Exhibit O - MacGregor v. Farmers Ins., #14 Exhibit P - Mason v. Granholm, #15 Exhibit Q - McFadden v. Krause, #16 Exhibit R - McNelley v. Aldi, #17 Exhibit S - Nicholas v. CMRE Fin., #18 Exhibit T - O'Neal v. Wackenhut, #19 Exhibit U - Parrish v. Ford, #20 Exhibit V - Pickering v. Lorillard, #21 Exhibit W- Powell v. Tosh, #22 Exhibit X - Puffer v. Allstate, #23 Exhibit Y - Reeb v. Ohio, #24 Exhibit Z - Rikos v. Proctor & Gamble, #25 Exhibit AA - Roussell v. Brinker, #26 Exhibit BB - Rumburg v. Sec'y of the Arm, #27 Exhibit CC - Scott v. Family Dollar, #28 Exhibit DD - Serrano v. Cintas, #29 Exhibit EE - Webb v. Fed. Exp., #30 Exhibit FF - Welch v. Eli Lilly, #31 Exhibit GG - Whitaker v. Tenn. Valley, #32 Exhibit HH - White v. Baptist Mem'l, #33 Exhibit II - Williams v. Allstate)(Johnston, Michael)
July 6, 2012 Filing 31 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint, or, Alternatively, Motion to strike filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit B - EEOC Attorney Designation)(Johnston, Michael)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' unopposed motion for four day extension of time to through and including July 6, 2012 to file motion to dismiss in light of intervening Sixth Circuit Opinion is Granted to 7/6/12. Brief in opposition is due 8/13/12. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/2/12. (LC,S) re #30
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. Case Management Conference is set 10/12/12 at 9:00 a.m. A ruling on the Motion to Dismiss will be issued by that date. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/2/12. (Related Doc #25 ) (LC,S)
July 2, 2012 Filing 30 Unopposed Motion for extension of to file Motion to Dismiss until July 6, 2012 filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
June 28, 2012 Filing 29 Opposition to #25 Motion to stay Discovery filed by Delbert Harrison. (Goetz, Daniel)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' unopposed motion to confirm page limit, or in the alternative, for leave to enlarge the page limit applicable to their memorandum in support of their motion to dismiss the first amended class and collective action complaint is Granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/25/12. (Related Doc #28 ) (LC,S)
June 25, 2012 Filing 28 Unopposed Motion To Confirm Page Limit, Or In The Alternative, For Leave To Enlarge The Page Limit Applicable To Their Motion To Dismiss The First Amended Class And Collective Action Complaint filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, or Alternatively, Strike the Class Allegations is MOOT. An amended complaint has been filed. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/22/12. (LC,S) re #23
June 18, 2012 Filing 27 First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Delbert Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Claims People Review, Diversity Planning, December 2010, #2 Exhibit B-Emailed dated April 9, 2009) (Griffin, Mark) Modified on 1/8/2013 (LC,S). (SEALED PER ORDER OF 01/07/13)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Case Management Conference was set. Plaintiff intends to file an Amended Complaint on or before 6/18/12. A responsive pleading is to be filed on or before 7/02/12. The parties are to inform the Court by 6/22/12 as to the status of the Motion to Stay. A new Case Managment Conference date will be set after resolution of the Motion to Stay. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/8/12. (LC,S)
June 5, 2012 Filing 26 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Delbert Harrison, Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Johnston, Michael)
May 24, 2012 Filing 25 Motion to stay Discovery filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Bangas v. Potter, #3 Exhibit B - Bowens v. Columbus Metro, #4 Exhibit C - Falzone v. Licastro, #5 Exhibit D - Veracity Group, #6 Exhibit E - Williamson v. Recovery)(Johnston, Michael)
May 16, 2012 Filing 24 Appendix to Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, or, Alternatively, Strike the Class Allegations filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. Related document(s) #23 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Bizzell v. Target, #2 Exhibit D - Dorn v. GM, #3 Exhibit E - Douglas v. GE, #4 Exhibit F - Grant v. Metro. Gov., #5 Exhibit G - Hagler v. True Mfg., #6 Exhibit H - HDC v. City of Ann Arbor, #7 Exhibit I - In re Countrywide, #8 Exhibit J - In re Ford, #9 Exhibit K - Johnson v. State of Conn., #10 Exhibit L - Mason v. Granholm, #11 Exhibit M - McFadden v. Krause, #12 Exhibit N - O'Neal v. Wackenhut, #13 Exhibit O - Powell v. Tosh, #14 Exhibit P - Puffer v. Allstate, #15 Exhibit Q - Reeb v. Ohio, #16 Exhibit R - Ricks v. Potter, #17 Exhibit S - Rikos v. Proctor & Gamble, #18 Exhibit T - Rumberg v. Sec. of the Army, #19 Exhibit U - Scott v. Family Dollar, #20 Exhibit V - Serrano v. Cintas, #21 Exhibit W - Webb v. Fed. Express, #22 Exhibit X - Welch v. Eli Lilly, #23 Exhibit Y - Whitaker v. Tenn. Valley, #24 Exhibit Z - Williams v. Allstate)(Johnston, Michael)
May 16, 2012 Filing 23 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , or Alternatively,, Motion to strike Class Allegations filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit B - Attorney Designation)(Johnston, Michael)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Confirm Page Limit, or in the Alternative, for Leave to Enlarge the Page Limit Applicable to Their Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Motion and Brief in Opposition may be up to 30 pages in length. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/10/12. (Related Doc #22 ) (LC,S)
May 9, 2012 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion By Defendants To Confirm Page Limit, Or In The Alternative, For Leave To Enlarge The Page Limit Applicable To Their Memorandum In Support of Their Motion To Dismiss filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Joint Motion to Continue and Re-Set Case Management Conference to a Date After June 1, 2012 is GRANTED to 6/8/12 at 8:45 a.m. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/18/12. (LC,S) (Related Doc #15 )
April 18, 2012 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 18, 2012 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc.. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 18, 2012 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Progressive Corporation. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 18, 2012 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc.. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 18, 2012 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 18, 2012 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc.. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 18, 2012 Filing 15 Joint Motion for conference/hearing to Continue and Re-set Case Management Conference To A Date After June 1, 2012 filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co., Plaintiff Delbert Harrison. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Motion for attorney Samuel M. Matchett to Appear Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/12/12. (Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms.) (Related Doc #13 ) (LC,S)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Motion for attorney Michael W. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/12/12. (Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms.) (Related Doc #12 ) (LC,S)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to set May 16, 2012 as the Uniform Date for Defendants to Respoond to Plaintiff's Complaint is Granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/12/12. (LC,S) (Related Doc #14 ).
April 12, 2012 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for leave to Set May 16, 2012 as the Uniform Date For Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 11, 2012 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Samuel M. Matchett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-5291841, filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commercia Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission, #2 Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing)(Mersol, Gregory) Modified exhibit text on 4/12/2012 (G,CA).
April 11, 2012 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Michael W. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-5291787, filed by Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing)(Mersol, Gregory) Modified exhibit text on 4/12/2012 (G,CA).
April 11, 2012 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Gregory V. Mersol filed by on behalf of Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Mersol, Gregory)
April 11, 2012 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Stephen C. Sutton filed by on behalf of Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co.. (Sutton, Stephen)
April 6, 2012 Filing 9 Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., c/o its Statutory Agent, CT Corporation and delivered on 4/2/12. (E,P)
April 6, 2012 Filing 8 Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to The Progressive Corporation, c/o its Statutory Agent, CT Corporation System and delivered on 4/2/12. (E,P)
April 4, 2012 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. on 4/2/2012; Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. on 4/2/2012, filed on behalf of Delbert Harrison (B,R)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 5/3/2012 at 9:30 a.m. to be held telephonically by Hon.Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 4/04/12. (D,MB)
April 2, 2012 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk executed upon Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. by certified mail through CT Corporation System, filed on behalf of Plaintiff. Related document(s) #1 . (B,B)
March 30, 2012 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Corporation, Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70081830000065655161/5185/5192/5208. (C,B)
March 29, 2012 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. on 3/27/2012; Progressive Corporation on 3/27/2012; Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. on 3/27/2012; Progressive Direct Insurance Co. on 3/27/2012, filed on behalf of Delbert Harrison. (K,K)
March 27, 2012 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70081830000065655154. (C,BA)
March 27, 2012 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk executed upon Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. by certified mail on 3/26/2012, filed on behalf of Plaintiff. Related document(s) #1 . (B,B)
March 23, 2012 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co., The Progressive Corporation placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70081830000065655055/5062/5079/5086/5093/5109. (C,B)
March 21, 2012 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co., The Progressive Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (C,B)
March 13, 2012 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Vecchiarelli. (C,B)
March 13, 2012 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (C,B)
March 13, 2012 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., Progressive Direct Insurance Co., The Progressive Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 350, Receipt number 0647-5235941. Filed by Delbert Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Civil Summons for The Progressive Corporation, #3 Summons Civil Summons for Progressive Casualty Insurance Co., #4 Summons Civil Summons for Progressive Direct Insurance Co., #5 Summons Civil Summons for Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., #6 Summons Civil Summons for Progressive Commercial Holdings, Inc., #7 Summons Civil Summons for Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc.) (Griffin, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Progressive Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert Harrison
Represented By: Peter S. Hardin-Levine
Represented By: Daniel P. Petrov
Represented By: Mark D. Griffin
Represented By: Daniel P. Goetz
Represented By: Christopher P. Thorman
Represented By: R. Eric Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Wayne Johnston
Represented By: Samuel M. Matchett
Represented By: Stephen C. Sutton
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Wayne Johnston
Represented By: Samuel M. Matchett
Represented By: Stephen C. Sutton
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Companies 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Co.
Represented By: Michael Wayne Johnston
Represented By: Samuel M. Matchett
Represented By: Stephen C. Sutton
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Corporation
Represented By: Michael Wayne Johnston
Represented By: Samuel M. Matchett
Represented By: Stephen C. Sutton
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Wayne Johnston
Represented By: Samuel M. Matchett
Represented By: Stephen C. Sutton
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Commerical Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Wayne Johnston
Represented By: Samuel M. Matchett
Represented By: Stephen C. Sutton
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?