Hardy Industrial Technologies, LLC v. BJB, LLC
Plaintiff: Hardy Industrial Technologies, LLC
Defendant: BJB, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv03097
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: Defendant's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena (Doc. 39 ) is granted, and NonParty Magnus International Group, Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Quash Subpoena (Doc. 40 ) is denied. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/15/17. (LC,S)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: This matter is before the Court upon Defendant's Motion to Reopen Case and Request for Local Rule 37.1 Conference (Doc. 31 ) and NonParty Magnus International Group, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Defendant 's Post-Judgment Subpoenas (Doc. 32 ). Defendant's motion is DENIED, and Magnus's motion is GRANTED with respect to the subpoenas issued to Cargill, Incorporated; Lake Erie Biofuels, LLC; and Purina Animal Nutrition, LLC. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/4/17. (LC,S)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum of Opinion and Order: Hardy Industrial Technologies, LLC's Motion to Vacate, Modify, or Correct Arbitration Award (Doc. 20 ) is DENIED. The arbitrators' award is hereby confirmed. Agri Trading's request for attorneys' fees in responding to Hardys motion is DENIED. Hardy had an objectively reasonable basis for filing its motion. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/16/16. (LC,S)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Entry of Dismissal that: having granted Defendant's motion for reconsideration of the Court's March 25 order staying arbitration of disputes arising under the 2012 Sales Contract, hereby dismisses this action. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/20/2013. (Related doc 15 , 18 )(B,B) Modified text on 6/20/2013 (B,B).
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Stay of Arbitration and for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. The Court hereby stays arbitration of any disputes for the sale of corn oil to be d elivered in 2012. Those matters must be decided by this Court. However, disputes arising under Purchase Order 319298 must be arbitrated. The Court finds that this matter should be stayed until the resolution of the arbitration involving Purchase Order 319298. This case is removed from the Court's active docket until such time as either party notifies the Court that the arbitration of the 2011 dispute has been resolved. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/25/13. (LC,S) re 3
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy Industrial Technologies, LLC v. BJB, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardy Industrial Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas P. Capotosto
Represented By: Keven D. Eiber
Represented By: David Sporar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJB, LLC
Represented By: Jason D. Groppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?