United States of America v. Willis et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James R Willis, Juanita E. Wooten, Cuyahoga County Treasurer and Ohio Department of Taxation
Case Number: 1:2013cv01127
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Filing 34 Satisfaction of Judgment filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #33 .(Kukso, Boris)
May 20, 2014 Filing 33 Judgment. The Court has filed its opinion and order in this matter. Accordingly, this action is terminated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/20/2014. (H,CM)
May 20, 2014 Filing 32 Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related doc #31 ) is granted. Judgment is entered against Defendant James R. Willis as outlined herein. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/20/2014. (H,CM)
March 12, 2014 Filing 31 Motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Deed, #3 Exhibit B - Divorce Judgment, #4 Exhibit C - IRS Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - Tax Liens, #6 Exhibit E - Tax Judgment, #7 Exhibit F - Abstract of Judgment)(Bixby, Christina)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order granting Stipulation and Consent Order regarding Defendant Ohio Department of Taxation (Related doc #29 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/13/2014. (H,CM)
February 13, 2014 Filing 29 Proposed Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Ohio Department of Taxation filed by United States of America. (Bixby, Christina) Modified text on 2/18/2014 (P,G).
February 7, 2014 Filing 28 Civil Trial Order. Bench Trial set for 7/9/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/7/2014. (H,CM)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order. Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2014 at 2:00 PM is canceled. Defendant's Motion for continuance (Related doc #26 ) is overruled as moot. Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2014; opposition briefs due by 4/14/2014; and reply brief by 4/28/2014. The Court will not entertain any extensions of the motion briefing deadlines. Bench Trial set for 7/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15B. The Court will consider holding settlement discussions, but only upon the joint motion of the parties. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/7/2014. (H,CM)
February 7, 2014 Filing 26 Motion to continue Status Conference filed by Defendant James R Willis. (Watson, Myron)
February 5, 2014 Filing 25 Affidavit/Declaration filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #24 . (Bixby, Christina)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order. Defendant James Willis' Motion to continue (Related Doc #22 ) is granted in part. Settlement Conference reset for 2/12/2014 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 15B. Parties with authority shall be present and shall comply with the Court's Standing Settlement Conference Order. Defendant Willis shall provide the discovery requested by Plaintiff or the Court will order sanctions, up to and including striking Defendant's Answer from the record. Plaintiff shall advise the Court one week prior to the Settlement Conference that the discovery materials have been provided. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/15/2014.(H,CM)
January 15, 2014 Filing 23 Response to #22 Motion to continue Status Conference (Settlement Conference) filed by United States of America. (Bixby, Christina)
January 14, 2014 Filing 22 Motion to continue Status Conference filed by Defendant James R Willis. (Watson, Myron)
December 11, 2013 Filing 21 Emergency Motion for leave to extend time for discovery and reschedule the Settlement Conference filed by Defendant James R Willis. (Watson, Myron) Modified text on 12/16/2013 (P,G).
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Defendant James Willis' Motion to extend discovery and reschedule Settlement Conference (Related Doc #21 ) is granted in part. Discovery due by 1/30/2014. Settlement Conference reset for 1/30/2014 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 15B. No further extensions. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/11/2013.(H,CM)
December 10, 2013 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance by David M. Douglass and Sean F. Berney filed by on behalf of Ohio Department of Taxation. (Douglass, David) Modified text on 12/12/2013 (P,G).
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to excuse representative's personal appearance at settlement conference (Related Doc #19 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/9/2013.(H,CM)
December 6, 2013 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion to excuse appearance of Person with Ultimate Settlement Authority at Settlement Conference filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Related document(s) #18 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Bixby, Christina)
September 20, 2013 Filing 18 Settlement Conference Order. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/20/2013. (H,CM)
September 20, 2013 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Case Management Conference held on 9/20/2013. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 11/12/2013. Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2013. Settlement Conference set for 12/12/2013 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 15B. Parties with authority shall appear and comply with the Court's Settlement Conference Order. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 30 min.) (H,CM)
September 16, 2013 Filing 17 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by United States of America. (Bixby, Christina)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to attend conference by telephone (Related Doc #16 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/16/2013.(H,CM)
September 13, 2013 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion to attend Case Management Conference by telephone filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Related document(s) #10 . (Bixby, Christina)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Cuyahoga County Treasurer (Related doc #14 ), each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/13/2013. (H,CM)
September 12, 2013 Filing 14 Proposed Stipulation and Consent Order regarding Cuyahoga County Treasurer filed by United States of America. (Bixby, Christina) Modified text on 9/13/2013 (P,G).
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order granting parties' Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Juanita Wooten (Related doc #12 ), each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/12/2013. (H,CM)
September 11, 2013 Filing 12 Proposed Stipulation and Consent as to Juanita E. Wooten filed by United States of America. (Bixby, Christina) Modified text on 9/12/2013 (P,G).
September 6, 2013 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by James R Willis. (Watson, Myron)
August 19, 2013 Filing 10 Notice of Case Management Conference. Conference to be held on 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM at Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/19/2013. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(H,CM)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant James Willis' #9 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/6/2013 to Answer. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/7/2013.(H,CM)
August 6, 2013 Filing 9 Corrected Motion for extension of time of thirty days to file Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant James R Willis. Related document(s) #8 , #1 . (Watson, Myron) Modified text on 8/7/2013 (P,G).
August 6, 2013 Filing 8 Motion for extension of time to file Responsive Pleading for a period of thirty days filed by Defendant James R Willis. Related document(s) #1 . (Watson, Myron) Modified text on 8/7/2013 (P,G).
July 30, 2013 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. James R Willis waiver sent on 6/6/2013, answer due 8/5/2013. filed on behalf of United States of America (Bixby, Christina)
July 16, 2013 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Juanita E. Wooten waiver sent on 6/6/2013, answer due 8/5/2013. filed on behalf of United States of America (Bixby, Christina)
July 2, 2013 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Ohio Department of Taxation. (Ward, Lucas)
June 18, 2013 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Cuyahoga County Treasurer. (Giunta, Anthony)
May 23, 2013 Filing 3 Notice of Lis Pendens filed by United States of America. (Bixby, Christina)
May 20, 2013 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Cuyahoga County Treasurer, Ohio Department of Taxation, James R Willis & Juanita E. Wooten. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (C,BA)
May 20, 2013 Filing 1 Complaint against Cuyahoga County Treasurer, Ohio Department of Taxation, James R Willis, Juanita E. Wooten.. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Willis, #3 Summons Wooten, #4 Summons County, #5 Summons Ohio, #6 Exhibit A - Deed, #7 Exhibit B - Divorce Judgment, #8 Exhibit C - Judgment, #9 Exhibit D - Abstract of Judgment) (Bixby, Christina)
May 20, 2013 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (C,BA)
May 20, 2013 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Baughman. (C,BA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Willis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Represented By: Steven M. Dettelbach_AUSA
Represented By: Christina M. Bixby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Willis
Represented By: Myron P. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita E. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County Treasurer
Represented By: Anthony J. Giunta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Taxation
Represented By: David M. Douglass
Represented By: Lucas C. Ward
Represented By: Sean F. Berney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?