Carter v. Lake County, Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Donise Carter
Defendant: Lake County Ohio, Daniel A. Dunlap, Marc J. McNaughton, Prime Health Inc. and Nita L. Brickman
Case Number: 1:2015cv00037
Filed: January 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Opinion and Order. Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony or Argument based on Testimony of Dr. Lawrence Mendel (Related doc # 83 ) is granted. The opinions and testimony of Dr. Mendel are, therefore, excluded. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/4/2018. (H,CM)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Opinion and Order. Defendants Marc McNaughton and Prime Health's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Related doc # 59 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/23/2017. (H,CM)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Related doc # 39 ) is granted. Defendants' Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings (Related doc #'s 36 , 38 ) are denied as moot. Plaintiff shall file her amended pleading by 8/5/2016. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/27/2016. (H,CM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Lake County, Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donise Carter
Represented By: Jennifer L. Branch
Represented By: Sara M. Gedeon
Represented By: Adam G. Gerhardstein
Represented By: Alphonse A. Gerhardstein
Represented By: David B. Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Ohio
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Represented By: Cara M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Dunlap
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Represented By: Cara M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc J. McNaughton
Represented By: David H. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Health Inc.
Represented By: W. Bradford Longbrake
Represented By: David T. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nita L. Brickman
Represented By: Todd M. Raskin
Represented By: Cara M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?