United States v. Shivey
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Michael Shivey
Case Number: 1:2015cv02453
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lorain
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2017 Filing 20 Abstract of Judgment issued on 2/2/2017 for judgment against Michael Shivey in the amount of $326,805.59 plus interest. Related document(s) #18 . (D,JJ)
February 2, 2017 Filing 19 Praecipe for issuance of Abstract of Judgment . filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Abstract of Judgment)(Schifano, Larry)
November 10, 2016 Filing 18 Judgment Entry in favor of United States against Michael Shivey in the amount of $326,805.59. Interest has accrued and shall accrue on this adjudged liability on and after August 1, 2016, as specified in 26 U.S.C. 6601, 6621-6622, 28 U.S.C. 1961(c), along with all other statutory additions. Further, under 26 U.S.C. 6321-22, the amounts due, described herein, constitute liens in favor of the United States upon all property and rights to property belonging to Michael Shivey; further, the parties shall bear their own litigation costs, including attorney fees; and further adjudged that this judgment decides all claims raised in the pleadings as to all parties joined in this action; so under Fed.R.Civ.P.54(b), this judgment is final. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 11/10/2016. (D,M)
November 9, 2016 Filing 17 Joint Motion for Entry of Judgment filed by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Schifano, Larry)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #16 Motion for Extension of Time Until 11/7/2016, to File Response to Plaintiff's (re #12 ) Motion for Summary Judgment. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 11/7/2016. (D,M)
October 24, 2016 Filing 16 Second Motion for extension of time until 11/7/2016 to file response/reply to #12 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Michael Shivey. Related document(s) #12 . (Bilfield, Murray)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Shivey's #15 Supplemental Motion for Extension of Time Until 10/24/2016, to File Response to Plaintiff's (re #12 ) Motion for Summary Judgment. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 10/12/2016.(D,M)
October 7, 2016 Filing 15 Supplemental Motion for extension of time until 10/24/2016 to file response/reply to #12 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Michael Shivey. Related document(s) #12 . (Bilfield, Murray) Modified text on 10/11/2016 (S,SR).
September 26, 2016 Filing 14 Motion for extension of time until 10/10/2016 to file response/reply to #12 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Michael Shivey. Related document(s) #12 . (Bilfield, Murray)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Michael Shivey's #14 Motion for Extension of Time Until 10/10/2016, to File Response/Reply to (re #12 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 9/26/2016.(D,M)
August 26, 2016 Filing 13 Notice of Service of Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Papers on 8/25/16 filed by United States. Related document(s) #12 .(Schifano, Larry) Modified text on 8/26/2016 (E,P).
August 25, 2016 Filing 12 Motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Supporting Brief, #3 Declaration of Christine Kovacevic, #4 Proposed Judgment)(Schifano, Larry)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting the United States' uncontested #11 Motion to Revise Summary Judgment Schedule. Motion for Summary Judgment by the United States due 8/25/2016; Response by Micheal Shivey due 9/26/2016; and Reply by United States due 10/11/2016. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 8/22/2016.(D,M)
August 17, 2016 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file motion for Summary Judgment until August 25, 2016 filed by Plaintiff United States. (Schifano, Larry)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Conference Order/Minutes of Case Management Conference held on 5/10/2016. Case is assigned to the standard track. The government will have until 8/18/2016, to file its motion for summary judgment, and the parties will exchange pre-discovery disclosures by that date. Defendant's response to the summary judgment motion will be due 9/19/2016, and a reply will be due by 10/4/2016. The parties indicated that formal discovery is not necessary at this time, and they agreed to discuss possible resolution of the case prior to the filing of any summary judgment briefing. The court determined that Alternative Dispute Resolution would not be useful at this time. Time: 30 minutes. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 5/11/2016. (D,M)
May 6, 2016 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by United States. (Schifano, Larry)
April 21, 2016 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,M)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 5/10/2016, at 1:30 PM at Chambers 19A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 4/20/2016. (D,M)
March 31, 2016 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Greg White. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,TL)
March 14, 2016 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Michael Shivey. (Bilfield, Murray)
February 25, 2016 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Michael Shivey on 2/20/2016, filed on behalf of United States Related document(s) #1 . (Schifano, Larry)
February 19, 2016 Filing 4 Original Summons issued electronically to counsel on 2/19/16 for service upon Michael Shivey. (E,P)
February 19, 2016 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons for Michael Shivey. filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Schifano, Larry)
December 1, 2015 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (C,BA)
December 1, 2015 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (C,BA)
December 1, 2015 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Greg White. (C,BA)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1 Complaint against Michael Shivey.. Filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schifano, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Shivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Larry S. Schifano
Represented By: Steven M. Dettelbach_AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shivey
Represented By: Murray D. Bilfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?