Armstrong et al v. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA et al
Plaintiff: Armstrong, Nicholas D Davis, Mathew C Taylor, Barron C Armstrong, Thomas E Masten II, William R Goodson, Daniel F Martin, Jeffrey K Mitchell, Jack Thompson, Malcolm Crunk and James D Suggs
Defendant: Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA and Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA
Case Number: 1:2016cv01664
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] On June 27, 2018, counsel contacted a member of the Court's staff to report that the parties, who settled the case on April 9, 2018, were unable to agree to the terms of a settlement agreement. Following the submission of position letters, the Court held a teleconference with Attorneys Martinsek, Yeagley, Mando Dow and Lewis to discuss the matter. Nothing further was scheduled. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 15 minutes. (K,K)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order of Stipulated Dismissal with prejudice. The Court held a settlement conference on April 9, 2018, at which time the Court helped the parties mediate a settlement. Accordingly, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to ensure that the settlement agreement is executed. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/9/2018. (K,K)
April 9, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Settlement Conference held on 4/9/2018. Case settled. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 5 hours 30 minutes. (K,K)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen NS Southern Lines GCA's Motion for Mark Wallace to participate in Settlement Conference via telephone (Related Doc #45 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/3/2018.(K,K)
April 3, 2018 Filing 45 Motion to attend Settlement Conference by telephone filed by Defendant Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA. (Mando, Joseph)
March 28, 2018 Filing 44 Attorney Appearance by Amanda J. Martinsek filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Martinsek, Amanda)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Trial Order Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/20/2018 at 1:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 8/27/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Trial documents are due to the court no later than 12:00 p.m. on 8/13/2018. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/22/2018. (K,K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2018: #1 Trial Order with corrected hearing dates (year change only)) (K,K).
March 20, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Scheduled teleconference held on 3/20/18. As a result of discussions, the Court scheduled a Settlement Conference in chambers beginning at 9:00 a.m. on Monday, April 9, 2018. Counsel and all clients with full settlement authority must attend in person. The Court expects the parties to continue their discussions between now and then, and to submit to chambers, no later than 12:00 noon on Wednesday, April 4, 2018, a joint submission stating what the parties agree on, where the impasse is, and the parties' proposals to bridge the gap. Failing settlement, the Court scheduled a trial beginning at 9:00 a.m. on Monday, August 27, 2018. The trial, including deliberations, shall take no more than four days. A Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled at 1:00 p.m. on Monday, August 20, 2018. At counsel's request, the discovery deadline is extended to Monday, May 28, 2018. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 30 minutes. (K,K)
March 19, 2018 Filing 42 Notice of Participants in the March 20, 2018 Telephone Conference filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA. (Faulkner, George)
March 19, 2018 Filing 41 Joint Position Statement filed by Barron C Armstrong, Malcolm Crunk, Nicholas D Davis, William R Goodson, Daniel F Martin, Thomas E Masten II, Jeffrey K Mitchell, James D Suggs, Mathew C Taylor, Jack Thompson, Transportation Division of the International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers General Committees of Adjustment. (Yeagley, David) s/ by Stephen Markus. Modified text on 3/19/2018 (S,SR).
March 19, 2018 Filing 40 Notice of Participants in the March 20, 2018 Telephone Conference filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John)
March 19, 2018 Filing 39 Notice of Participants on behalf of Plaintiffs in the March 20, 2018 Telephone Conference filed by Barron C Armstrong, Malcolm Crunk, Nicholas D Davis, William R Goodson, Daniel F Martin, Thomas E Masten II, Jeffrey K Mitchell, James D Suggs, Mathew C Taylor, Jack Thompson, Transportation Division of the International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers General Committees of Adjustment. (Yeagley, David)
March 2, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Scheduled teleconference held on 3/2/2018. As a result of discussions, the Court made a proposal for resolving the dispute. The Court directed counsel and clients to confer and discuss this proposal and scheduled a followup teleconference beginning at 10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, March 20, 2018 with counsel and clients. The same call-in instructions used for today's teleconference shall be used for the March 20 teleconference. Counsel shall file a notice of all teleconference participants who will attend the March 20 teleconference, and a joint status report of negotiations, no later than 12 noon on Monday, March 19, 2018. Time: 15 min. (P,R)
February 28, 2018 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] Telephone Conference RESET for 3/2/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
February 27, 2018 Filing 38 Notice of Participants on Behalf of Plaintiffs in the March 1, 2018 Telephone Conference filed by William R Goodson, Daniel F Martin, Thomas E Masten II, Jeffrey K Mitchell, James D Suggs, Mathew C Taylor, Jack Thompson, Transportation Division of the International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers General Committees of Adjustment. (Yeagley, David)
February 9, 2018 Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference with counsel and clients set for 3/1/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
February 8, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Scheduled teleconference held on 2/8/18 with Attorneys Markus, Yeagley, Mando, Lewis and Dow. Counsel reported on the status of their negotiations. Nothing further was scheduled. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 10 minutes. (K,K)
January 18, 2018 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. The Court held a scheduled teleconference on 1/18/2018 with Attorneys Markus and Yeagley for Plaintiffs and Smart TD, Attorneys Faulkner and Mando for Defendant BLET, and Attorneys Dow and Lewis for Defendant Norfolk Southern. Counsel reported on the progress of their discussions. The Court scheduled a followup teleconference beginning at 3:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 8, 2018. Counsel shall use the same call-in instructions used for today's teleconference.(Court Reporter: n/a.)Time: 15 minutes. (W,CM) Modified to correct date of teleconference on 1/19/2018 (W,CM).
October 31, 2017 Filing 37 Attorney Appearance by David D. Yeagley and Stephen A. Markus filed by on behalf of Transportation Division of the International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers General Committees of Adjustment. Related document(s) #36 .(Yeagley, David)
October 16, 2017 Copy of #36 Minutes of Teleconference and Scheduling Order mailed to International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers,Transportation Division at 24950 Country Club Boulevard, Suite 340North Olmsted, Ohio 44070 on 10/16/2017. (K,K)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minutes of Teleconference and Scheduling Order. The Court held a scheduled teleconference on October 16, 2017. As a result of discussions, the Court determined that Plaintiffs' union, the International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Transportation Division ("SMART-TD"), is an indispensable party because complete relief cannot be accorded in its absence and because all of Plaintiffs claims arise out of their membership in SMART-TD. This case is primarily a dispute between two unions and their members. Accordingly, the Court solicited and granted Attorney Faulkners verbal motion to join SMART-TD, which will be joined as a co-Plaintiff. As the discovery cutoff is April 27, 2018 and SMART-TD is not a stranger to this dispute, all agreed that it is not necessary to extend the discovery cutoff date for SMART-TD. The Court also scheduled a call-in teleconference beginning at 12:00 noon on Thursday, January 18, 2018. The Court will email call-in instructions to counsel. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/16/2017. Time: 15 minutes. (K,K)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stipulated Protective Order . Related document (Related Doc #34 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/16/2017.(K,K)
October 16, 2017 Filing 34 Joint Motion for entry of stipulated protective order filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Lewis, John) Modified text 10/16/2017 (C,KA).
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order approving #32 Joint Proposed Order of discovery plan and schedule. A Status Telephone Conference is set for 10/16/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Call-in instructions to be provided separately. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/20/2017. (K,K)
July 20, 2017 Filing 32 Proposed Order of discovery plan and schedule filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #28 . (Yeagley, David)
July 14, 2017 Filing 31 Answer to #15 Amended complaint, filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA. (Mando, Joseph) Modified text on 7/17/2017 (S,Ke).
July 14, 2017 Filing 30 Answer to #15 Amended complaint, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA answer due 7/14/2017; Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA answer due 7/14/2017; Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA answer due 7/14/2017; Norfolk Southern Railway Company answer due 7/14/2017. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/10/2017.(K,K)
July 7, 2017 Filing 29 Joint Motion for extension of time until July 14, 2017 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA. (Mando, Joseph)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Teleconference Minutes and Order Telephone Conference held on 6/20/2017. For the reasons stated in the Order, the defendants' Motions to Dismiss, Doc #s: #17 , #18 , are denied without prejudice. The parties will submit to the Court, by July 20, 2017, either a discovery schedule or a notice of renewal of settlement negotiations. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/21/2017. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 12 minutes. (K,K) Modified text 6/21/2017 (C,KA).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] approving the parties' request for an additional 90 days to continue settlement efforts. The telephone conference set for March 14, 2017 is cancelled. A follow-up telephone conference is reset for 6/20/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Call-in instructions remain the same. Related document #27 . Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/10/2017. (K,K)
March 9, 2017 Filing 27 Letter regarding March 14, 2017 Conference filed by All Plaintiffs. (Yeagley, David)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order approving #25 Stipulation regarding settlement negotiations. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/8/2017. (K,K) Modified text 3/9/2017 (C,KA).
March 8, 2017 Filing 25 Stipulation regarding settlement negotiations filed by All Plaintiffs. (Yeagley, David) Modified text 3/8/2017 (C,KA).
January 12, 2017 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Scheduled teleconference was held on 1/12/2017 attended by Attorneys Markus and Yeagley for Plaintiffs, Attorneys Faulkner and Mando for Defendant BLET, and Attorneys Lewis and Hawkins for Defendant NSR. Counsel agreed to confer with regard to settlement, and a followup call-in teleconference was scheduled to begin at 2:00 p.m. Eastern Time on Tuesday, March 14, 2017. The Court will email new call-in instructions to counsel. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 15 minutes. (K,K)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiffs' Motion for leave of Court to to File Sur-Reply (Related Doc #24 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/12/2017.(K,K) Modified text 1/18/2017 (C,KA).
January 11, 2017 Filing 24 Motion for leave of Court to to File Sur-Reply filed by Barron C Armstrong, Malcolm Crunk, Nicholas D Davis, William R Goodson, Daniel F Martin, Thomas E Masten II, Jeffrey K Mitchell, James D Suggs, Mathew C Taylor, Jack Thompson. Related document(s) #20 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consolidated Sur-Reply of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit 1 Chicago Agreement )(Yeagley, David) Modified text 1/18/2017 (C,KA).
January 6, 2017 Filing 23 Reply brief in support of #17 its Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim of James A. Houk)(Lewis, John) Modified text 1/9/2017 (C,KA).
January 6, 2017 Filing 22 Reply brief in support of #18 its Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA. (Mando, Joseph) Modified text 1/9/2017 (C,KA).
December 20, 2016 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] After reviewing the Motions to Dismiss and Response Brief, the Court held on Dec. 20, 2016, an impromptu teleconference attended by Plaintiffs' attorneys Stephen A. Markus and David D. Yeagley, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen (BLET) Defendants' attorneys George H. Faulkner and Joseph D. Mando, and Defendant Norfolk Southern's attorneys John B. Lewis and Robert S. Hawkins. The Court and counsel discussed the case. After the discussion, the Court scheduled a follow-up teleconference for Jan. 12, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 40 minutes. (K,K) Modified text 12/21/2016 (C,KA).
December 20, 2016 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 12/20/2016 at 11:30 AM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
December 13, 2016 Utility Event set/reset motion deadlines as to Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Replies due by 1/6/2017. Related document(s) #18 , #17 . (K,K)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #21 defendants' Motion for extension of time to file reply brief in support of #17 and #18 Motions to dismiss. Replies due no later than 1/6/2017. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 12/13/2016.(K,K) Modified text; notice regenerated 12/13/2016 (K,K). Modified text 12/13/2016 (C,KA).
December 12, 2016 Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for extension of Reply Brief until January 6, 2017 filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Related document(s) #17 , #18 . (Lewis, John)
December 8, 2016 Filing 20 Consolidated memorandum in Opposition to #17 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #18 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Yeagley, David) Modified text 12/8/2016 (C,KA).
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #19 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 8, 2016 to file consolidated brief in opposition to motions to dismiss. Related documents #17 , #18 . Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/4/2016.(K,K)
November 3, 2016 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 8, 2016 to file consolidated brief in opposition to motions to dismiss filed by Barron C Armstrong, Malcolm Crunk, Nicholas D Davis, William R Goodson, Daniel F Martin, Thomas E Masten II, Jeffrey K Mitchell, James D Suggs, Mathew C Taylor, Jack Thompson. Related document(s) #17 , #18 . (Yeagley, David) Modified text 11/3/2016 (C,KA).
October 6, 2016 Filing 18 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA. Related document(s) #15 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, 2015-2019 CBA With Side Letters)(Faulkner, George)
October 6, 2016 Filing 17 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Related document(s) #15 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Lewis, John) Modified text 10/7/2016 (C,KA).
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #16 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/4/2016.(K,K) Modified text 10/4/2016 (C,KA).
October 3, 2016 Filing 16 Motion for leave to exceed page limitations for Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Because Plaintiffs filed an #15 Amended Complaint, Motion to dismiss (Related Doc #13 ) and Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Related Doc #14 ) are denied as moot. See Glass v. The Kellogg Co., 252 F.R.D. 367, 368 (W.D. Mich. 2008). Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/21/2016.(K,K) Modified text 9/21/2016 (K,K).
September 19, 2016 Filing 15 First Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Thomas E Masten II, Nicholas D Davis, Jeffrey K Mitchell, Mathew C Taylor, Malcolm Crunk, James D Suggs, Barron C Armstrong, William R Goodson, Jack Thompson, Daniel F Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2007 CBA (excerpt), #2 Exhibit 2015 CBA (excerpt)) (Yeagley, David)
August 29, 2016 Filing 14 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Of BLET's Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, 2015-2019 Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Faulkner, George)
August 29, 2016 Filing 13 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Lewis, John)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Andrew J. Rolfes and Robert S. Hawkins for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc #10 , #11 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/29/2016.(K,K)
August 26, 2016 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Dustin M. Dow filed by on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Dow, Dustin)
August 26, 2016 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Andrew J. Rolfes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7777810, filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Andrew J. Rolfes, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Lewis, John) Modified exhibit text on 8/26/2016 (G,CA).
August 26, 2016 Filing 10 Motion for attorney Robert S. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7777724, filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert S. Hawkins, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Lewis, John) Modified exhibit on 8/26/2016 (G,CA).
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #7 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/24/2016.(K,K)
August 23, 2016 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by George H. Faulkner and Joseph D. Mando filed by on behalf of Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA. (Faulkner, George)
August 23, 2016 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John)
August 23, 2016 Filing 7 Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lewis, John)
July 29, 2016 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA waiver sent on 6/30/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Yeagley, David)
July 28, 2016 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA waiver sent on 6/30/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Yeagley, David)
July 28, 2016 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver sent on 6/30/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Yeagley, David)
July 28, 2016 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA waiver sent on 6/30/2016, answer due 8/29/2016. filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Yeagley, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR)
June 30, 2016 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
June 30, 2016 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (S,SR)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7691114. Filed by Thomas E Masten II, Nicholas D Davis, Jeffrey K Mitchell, Mathew C Taylor, Malcolm Crunk, James D Suggs, Barron C Armstrong, William R Goodson, Jack Thompson, Daniel F Martin. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Art. 33 of CBA, #2 Appendix Art. III of CBA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Yeagley, David) Modified text on 6/30/2016 (S,SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong et al v. Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas D Davis
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew C Taylor
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barron C Armstrong
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Masten II
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Goodson
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel F Martin
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey K Mitchell
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Thompson
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Crunk
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Suggs
Represented By: David D. Yeagley
Represented By: Stephen A. Markus
Represented By: Amanda J. Martinsek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Southern Lines GCA
Represented By: George H. Faulkner
Represented By: Joseph D. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John B. Lewis
Represented By: Robert S. Hawkins
Represented By: Andrew J. Rolfes
Represented By: Dustin M. Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen -- NS Eastern Lines GCA
Represented By: George H. Faulkner
Represented By: Joseph D. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen - NS Northern Lines GCA
Represented By: George H. Faulkner
Represented By: Joseph D. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?