Hank v. Great Lakes Construction Company et al
Plaintiff: Steven M Hank
Defendant: Great Lakes Construction Co. and Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers
Case Number: 1:2016cv02104
Filed: August 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Opinion and Order. The Court Adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Related doc # 192 ). Defendant Union's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related doc # 178 ) is granted. Defendant Union's Motion to Strike Hank's Affidavit (Related doc # 186 ) is denied. Defendant Union's Request to Remand is granted. Case is ordered remanded to Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas for further adjudication. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 1/16/2019. (H,CM)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Opinion and Order. The Court Adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Related doc # 152 ) and grants Defendant Great Lakes Construction Company's Limited Motion for Summary Judgment (Related doc # 107 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/17/2018. (H,CM)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order. The court DENIES Hank's request for sanctions and OVERRULES the portion of the motion seeking to re-depose Sliwinsky on the ground that it is MOOT. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/25/2017. (Related document 68 ) (O,K)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order granting Local 18's 43 Motion to Strike Errata Sheet. See order for complete details. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/2/2017.(O,K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hank v. Great Lakes Construction Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Hank
Represented By: Natalie F. Grubb
Represented By: Mark E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Construction Co.
Represented By: Brian J. Kelly
Represented By: Andrew M. Szilagyi
Represented By: Daniel A. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 18 International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: Timothy R. Fadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?