Metheney v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Tara Metheney and Larry Metheney
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2016cv02398
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Donald C. Nugent
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Memorandum Opinion and Order the United States' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF #63) is Denied. A Jury trial remains scheduled for October 15, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/11/18. (R,JM)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying defendant's Motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (Related Doc # 41 ). A status conference remains set for September 28, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Judge Donald C. Nugent 9/1/2017(C,KA)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Memorandum Opinion granting defendant's partial Motion to dismiss complaint 18 . Plaintiff Larry Metheney and the loss of consortium claim are dismissed with prejudice. Judge Donald C. Nugent 5/11/17(C,KA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metheney v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Metheney
Represented By: Matthew A. Mooney
Represented By: Paul G Perantinides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Metheney
Represented By: Matthew A. Mooney
Represented By: Paul G Perantinides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?