Kuczma v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kuczma and James A Kuczma
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv03072
Filed: December 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Filing 25 Judgment Entry Having filed its Memorandum of Opinion and Order affirming the Commissioner's decision, the Court hereby enters judgment for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, and against Plaintiff James A. Kuczma. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/16/2018. (JLG)
March 16, 2018 Filing 24 Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiff's Objections (ECF No. #22 ) are overruled and the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. #21 ) is adopted. The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is affirmed. Judgment will be entered in favor of Defendant. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/16/2018. (JLG)
November 3, 2017 Filing 23 Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Johnson, Lisa)
November 2, 2017 Filing 22 Objections to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation filed by James A Kuczma. (Wilson, Rachel)
October 19, 2017 Filing 21 Report and Recommendation that Commissioners final decision be AFFIRMED. Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 11/2/2017. Related document #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 10/19/2017. (S,SR)
June 29, 2017 Filing 20 Brief on the Merits filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Brizius, Erin)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting defendant's #19 Motion for extension of time until July 3, 2017 to File Brief. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 6/14/2017. (S,S)
June 12, 2017 Filing 19 Motion for extension of time until July 3, 2017 to File Defendant's Brief filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Johnson, Lisa)
May 18, 2017 Filing 18 Brief on the Merits filed by James A Kuczma. (Wilson, Rachel)
May 3, 2017 Filing 17 Magistrate Consent Package Re-issued. Given that all recent vacancies on the Magistrate Judge bench have been filled, the Court is reissuing the Magistrate Consent Package. (C,KA)
April 18, 2017 Filing 16 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #15 . (Brizius, Erin)
April 18, 2017 Filing 15 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Brizius, Erin)
April 17, 2017 Filing 14 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon All Defendants filed on behalf of James A Kuczma (Attachments: #1 Summons Proof of service, #2 Summons Proof of service, #3 Exhibit Receipt of certified mailing, #4 Exhibit date stamped copy of summons, #5 Exhibit Receipt of certified mailing)(Wilson, Rachel)
April 13, 2017 Minute Order [non-document] of Telephone Conference held on 4/12/2017. Participants included Rachel C. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff and Francesco Benavides on behalf of Defendant. The Court addressed issues relating to service of process in this case. While initially directing Plaintiff to properly perfect and prove service or file a waiver of service no later than Monday April 17, 2017, the Court has reconsidered this deadline in light of the upcoming holiday weekend. Plaintiff is allowed four additional days, until close of business Friday April 21, 2017, to properly perfect and prove service or file a waiver of service.Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 4/13/2017. (Time: 15 min.) (S,S)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] rescheduling Telephone Conference for 4/12/2017 at 5:00 p.m. Counsel shall dial into the Court's Telephone Conference Bridge following the instructions previously provided. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 4/12/2017. (S,S)
April 11, 2017 Filing 13 Motion to continue telephonic conference filed by Plaintiff James A Kuczma. (Wilson, Rachel) Modified on 4/13/2017 to terminate motion (S,S).
April 11, 2017 IMPORTANT: Notice of Hearing [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Counsel shall dial into the Court's Telephone Conference Bridge. The Court, via email, will provide counsel with instructions on accessing the Bridge. (S,S)
April 5, 2017 Filing 12 Response regarding service filed by James A Kuczma. (Wilson, Rachel) Modified text on 4/7/2017 (H,SN).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order: Plaintiff shall serve a properly issued summons and the complaint on all necessary parties within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, on or before April 7, 2017, and file a notice that service has been perfected, or show good cause why service has not been perfected. A failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that the case be dismissed for failure to perfect service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 3/24/2017. (Related documents #6 , #9 , #10 ) (S,S)
March 16, 2017 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - wrong summons used. Return of Service by certified mail executed upon U.S. Attorney General on 2/22/2017 filed on behalf of James A Kuczma (Wilson, Rachel) Modified text on 3/20/2017 (H,SN). Modified to note error on 4/11/2017 (S,SR).
March 16, 2017 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - wrong summons used. Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Commissioner of Social Security on 3/16/2017, filed on behalf of James A Kuczma (Wilson, Rachel) Modified to note error on 4/11/2017 (S,SR).
February 8, 2017 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 2/8/2017. (S,S)
February 8, 2017 Filing 6 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
February 8, 2017 Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 received from Wilson & Gillissie. Receipt # 14660092763 Related document(s) #5 . (S,SR)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Report and Recommendation #4 of the Magistrate Judge is adopted. Plaintiff's #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee of $400 within 14 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/25/2017. (E,CK)
January 5, 2017 Filing 4 Report and Recommendation that plaintiff's #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 1/5/2017. (S,S)
December 30, 2016 Filing 3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff James A Kuczma. (Wilson, Rachel)
December 23, 2016 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (P,WL)
December 23, 2016 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. (P,WL)
December 23, 2016 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (P,WL)
December 23, 2016 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (P,WL)
December 23, 2016 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid and is due. Filed by James A Kuczma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 U.S. Marshal Form, #6 U.S. Marshal Form, #7 U.S. Marshal Form) (Wilson, Rachel) Modified text on 12/23/2016 (P,WL). Modified fee due on 12/23/2016 (P,WL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuczma v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Dolores Garcia-Prignitz_AUSA
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuczma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Kuczma
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?