Alexander et al v. Honeywell International Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julia Alexander, Kenneth Alexander and Adam Alexander
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc., Ford Motor Company, Genuine Parts Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation and John Does
Cross_defendant: Honeywell International Inc., John Does, Ford Motor Company, Genuine Parts Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company and Pneumo Abex Corporation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00504
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Donald C. Nugent
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons set forth, Defendant, Honeywell International Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Plaintiffs' Common Law Causes of Action, (ECF # 93 ), is GRANTED. Counts one, two, three, four, and seven of the Amended Complaint are hereby dismissed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/6/2018. Related document 93 . (M,S)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Memorandum Opinion and Order The Motion to Strike Defendant Honeywell's Motion in Limine is denied, but the alternative request for leave to file a response in excess of twenty pages is granted. (ECF #110). Defendant's motion to prec lude expert testimony are both denied at this time. (ECF #80, 81). The Court reserves the right to re-visit the Defendant's arguments and objections, if appropriate, based on the evidence presented at trial. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/05/18. (R,JM)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Defendant Honeywell's request 55 for Summary Judgment based on Plaintiffs alleged failure to establish that Bendix products were a substantial factor in causing Plaintiffs injuries. Plaintiffs� 39; Motion to Amend the Order Allowing Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. Ninety Days After the Court's Ruling on Summary Judgment to Produce Expert Reports 63 is also denied. Defendant's expert reports are due on March 13, 2018. The previously scheduled status conference remains set for February 27, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/13/2017(C,KA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. Honeywell International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Alexander
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Brian R. Herberth
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alexander
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Brian R. Herberth
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Alexander
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Brian R. Herberth
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Represented By: Melanie M. Irwin
Represented By: Joseph D. Silvaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Susan Squire Box
Represented By: Leighann K. Fink
Represented By: John R. Reid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Thomas R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Caryl
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Ryan T. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Represented By: Joseph D. Silvaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Susan Squire Box
Represented By: Leighann K. Fink
Represented By: John R. Reid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Thomas R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Caryl
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Ryan T. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?